Humane Society of the United, et al v. Sonny Perdue
Original Case: 1:12-cv-01582
D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:18-cvus-05201 |
Type | civil us / united states |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Case Filed: | Jul 06, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 26, 2019 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Sonny Perdue, Secretary of the United States Department of Agriculture
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellee
National Pork Producers Council
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Humane Society of the United States
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Harvey Dillenburg
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Iowa Citizens for Community Improvement
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 23 2019
OPINION [1803360] filed (Pages: 9) for the Court by Judge Katsas. [18-5188, 18-5197, 18-5201] |
Docket last updated: 08/26/2019 4:26 AM EDT |
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 18-5201 | ||
21 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [1739402] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:12-cv-01582-ABJ filed by Harvey Dillenburg and Humane Society of the United States. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 18-5201 18-5201 | ||
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [1739417] filed consolidating cases 18-5197 18-5201 (Cross-appeal started 07/06/2018) with 18-5188 directing party to file in 18-5197 18-5201 initial submissions: APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT docketing statement due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT statement of issues due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT underlying decision due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT notice of appearance due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT transcript status report due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT procedural motions due 08/06/2018. APPELLANT/CROSS APPELLANT dispositive motions due 08/20/2018 18-5188 18-5197 18-5201 |