Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:18-bk-11625
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2018
Plan Confirmed:Oct 08, 2019

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Tintri, Inc.
303 Ravendale Dr
Mountain View, CA 94043-5228
Represented By
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801

GPO Aug 22 2024
Order (I) Sustaining The Liquidation Trustees Objection To Claim Nos. 138 And 159 Filed By Boomerang Carnets, (II) Reclassifying Claim No. 138, And (III) Disallowing Claim No. 159 In Its Entirety (related document(s)683, 688) Order Signed on 8/22/2024. (CMB)

1. Tintri rescued by DDN just hours after filing for Chapter 11 (theregister.co.uk)
Submitted Wed 07/11/2018
Docket last updated: 12 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
703 703 notice Address Change - Notice Mon 04/28 4:05 PM
Notice of Address Change Filed by CISCO SYSTEMS CAPITAL CORPORATION. (Heck, Gaye)
Related: [-]