New York Southern District Court
Judge:Loretta A Preska
Case #: 1:18-cv-06232
Nature of Suit320 Torts - Personal Injury - Assault, Libel, & Slander
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2018
Terminated:Jul 01, 2020
Last checked: Sunday Jan 06, 2019 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
John Does #1-11
Plaintiff
Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC
Represented By
Justin Harry Ryann Mercer
Lewis & Lin, LLC
contact info
David Dong Ann Lin
Lewis & Lin, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Dr. Muhammad Mirza
Represented By
Justin Harry Ryann Mercer
Lewis & Lin, LLC
contact info
David Dong Ann Lin
Lewis & Lin, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, July 20, 2020
minutes Pretrial Conference - Interim Wed 08/05 11:19 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Loretta A. Preska: Interim Pretrial Conference held on 7/20/2020. (mph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 16, 2020
54 54 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/16 9:42 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Valli on behalf of Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza..(Valli, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 15, 2020
53 53 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Wed 07/15 1:13 PM
ORDER granting52 Letter Motion for Conference re:51 Consent Judgment. The parties shall appear for a telephonic conference on July 20, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. EST. The dial-in for that conference is (888) 363-4734, access code: 4645450. The parties are directed to call in promptly at 10:00 a.m. SO ORDERED. Telephone Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Loretta A. Preska. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 7/15/2020) (va)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 14, 2020
52 52 motion Conference Tue 07/14 3:42 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:51 Consent Judgment,,,,,, addressed to Judge Loretta A. Preska from David D. Lin dated 07/14/2020. Document filed by Allied Medical and Diagnostic Services, LLC, Muhammad Mirza..(Lin, David)
Related: [-]