Connecticut District Court
Judge:Janet C Hall
Referred: Sarah A L Merriam
Case #: 3:18-cv-01136
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2018
Terminated:May 07, 2019
Last checked: Saturday Jan 05, 2019 4:31 AM EST
Defendant
Connecticut Department of Transportation
Defendant
Western Connecticut Mental Health
Defendant
West Hartford Dept of Housing
Defendant
West Hartford Dept Social Services
Defendant
United States Fair Housing and Equal Opportunity
Defendant
Statewide legal Services of Connecticut
Defendant
Social Security Administration ODAR
Defendant
Mental Health Connecticut
Defendant
Journey Home Connecticut
Defendant
Friends in Service to Humanity of Northwestern Connecticut
Defendant
Farmington Public High School
Defendant
Farmington Connecticut Social Services
Defendant
Connecticut Social Services
Defendant
Connecticut Family Court Hartford
Defendant
Connecticut Dept of Children and Family
Defendant
Connecticut Department of Housing
Defendant
Community Health and Wellness
469 Migeon Ave
Torrington, CT 06790
Defendant
Chrysalis Center, Inc.
Defendant
Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr
Defendant
United Way of Connecticut
Defendant
Susan B Anthony Project
Defendant
St. Vincent De Paul
Defendant
Prudence Crandall Center for Woman
Defendant
Northwest CT YMCA
Defendant
Gathering Place
Defendant
Friendship Service Center of New Britain Co.
Defendant
CMHA Emergency Winter Shelter
Plaintiff
Julie A. Miller
14 Bradley Street
Plainville, CT 06062
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Veyo Connecticut NEMT
Terminated: 08/06/2018


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Thursday, August 29, 2019
44 44 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 08/30 12:22 PM
MANDATE of USCA dated 8/29/2019 dismissing42 Notice of Appeal filed by Julie A. Miller Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Wednesday, May 15, 2019
43 43 appeal Clerk's Certificate re: Notice of Appeal Thu 05/16 8:41 AM
CLERK'S CERTIFICATE RE: INDEX AND RECORD ON APPEAL re:42 Notice of Appeal. The attached docket sheet is hereby certified as the entire Index/Record on Appeal in this matter and electronically sent to the Court of Appeals, with the exception of any manually filed documents as noted below. Robin D. Tabora, Clerk. Documents manually filed not included in this transmission: none Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
42 42 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 05/16 8:39 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to40 Order on Recommended Ruling by Julie A. Miller. Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
41 41 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/15 2:43 PM
Final NOTICE by Julie A. Miller (Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2019
40 40 1 pgs order Order on Recommended Ruling Tue 05/07 10:13 AM
ORDER granting38 Recommended Ruling, dismissing case with prejudice. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 5/7/2019. Related [+]
Related: [-] is, Julia
Friday, May 03, 2019
39 39 respoth Objection/Reply/Response to Recommended Ruling Fri 05/03 3:48 PM
OBJECTION to38 Recommended Ruling filed by Julie A. Miller. (Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2019
38 38 motion Recommended Ruling Tue 04/23 4:17 PM
RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the Court recommends that the Second Amended Complaint (Doc. #33 ) be DISMISSED, with prejudice. This is a recommended ruling. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(1). Any objections to this recommended ruling must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days of being served with this order . See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Failure to object within fourteen (14) days will preclude appellate review. See 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1); Rules 72, 6(a) and 6(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 72.2; Small v. Secretary of H.H.S. , 892 F.2d 15 (2d Cir. 1989) ( per curiam ); F.D.I.C. v. Hillcrest Assoc. , 66 F.3d 566, 569 (2d Cir. 1995). 25 Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 4/23/19. (Dowie, C)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 06, 2018
37 37 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 12/06 11:24 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Recommended Ruling re33 Second Amended Complaint SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 12/6/2018.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 20, 2018
36 36 order Order on Recommended Ruling Tue 11/20 7:13 PM
ORDER Affirming, Adopting and Ratifying18 Recommended Ruling. Plaintiff objected but stated no reason for her objection (Doc. No.20 ). Plaintiff notified the court she would file an Amended Complaint in response to this Ruling, which she has done. SO Ordered by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/20/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
35 35 order Order on Motion for Order Wed 11/14 10:04 AM
ORDER denying34 Motion for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 11/14/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 10, 2018
34 34 2 pgs motion Order Sat 11/10 7:32 PM
MOTION for execution Order by Julie A. Miller. (Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 31, 2018
33 33 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 10/31 2:11 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Julie A. Miller.(Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 29, 2018
32 32 order Order on Motion to Seal Case Mon 10/29 9:42 AM
ORDER denying23 Motion to Seal Case. Denied. There is a public right of access to court proceedings. Certain matters are sealed upon a showing justifying it. However, the desire of a litigant to deny public access for no reason does not justify sealing. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/29/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 25, 2018
31 31 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Thu 10/25 2:01 PM
ORDER denying26 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Denied. This court has no jurisdiction over the CHRO proceeding and there is and would be no basis to consolidate it with this court's case. Denying26 -1 Motion to Transfer. Denied. This court has no authority to transfer a case to the U.S.S.C. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/25/2018. (Lewis, D) Modified on 10/25/2018 (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
30 30 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Thu 10/25 1:58 PM
ORDER granting25 Motion to Waive Courtesy Copy Requirement. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/25/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion to Consolidate Cases Thu 10/25 1:48 PM
ORDER denying24 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Denied. There is no basis to consolidate a Social Security Administration appeal and a disability rights case. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/25/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
28 28 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 10/25 1:46 PM
ORDER granting27 MOTION for Extension of Time. Granted until 11/25/2018. Further extensions are unlikely. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/25/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 23, 2018
27 27 motion Extension of Time Tue 10/23 1:25 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time until 01/26/2019 2nd amendment by Julie A. Miller. (Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 10/23 1:11 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with by Julie A. Miller.Responses due by 11/13/2018(Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit
25 25 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 10/23 12:11 PM
MOTION by Julie A. Miller.Responses due by 11/13/2018 (Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
24 24 motion Consolidate Cases Tue 10/23 12:04 PM
MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 17-01734 by Julie A. Miller.Responses due by 11/13/2018(Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 motion to consolidate
23 23 motion Seal Case Tue 10/23 11:55 AM
First MOTION to Seal Case by Julie A. Miller. (Miller, Julie)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 22, 2018
22 22 order Electronic Filing Order (Self-Rep) Mon 10/22 4:45 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. SELF-REPRESENTED FILERS ARE REQUIRED TO COMPLY WITH THE JUDGE'S STANDARD ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER WHICH IS ATTACHED. Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/2018.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Order Mon 10/22 4:43 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 10/22/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
20 20 respoth Objection/Reply/Response to Recommended Ruling Thu 10/18 2:11 PM
OBJECTION to18 Recommended Ruling filed by Julie Miller. (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
19 19 2 pgs motion Order Thu 10/18 2:09 PM
MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Julie Miller.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Friday, October 05, 2018
18 18 motion Recommended Ruling Fri 10/05 4:09 PM
RECOMMENDED RULING. 21 Pages. For the reasons set forth in the attached ruling, the Court recommends that plaintiffs Amended Complaint be DISMISSED , without prejudice to refiling. If plaintiff wishes to pursue her claims, she may file a second amended complaint on or before October 26, 2018 . This is a recommended ruling. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(1). Any objections to this recommended ruling must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days of being served with this order . See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Failure to object within fourteen (14) days will preclude appellate review. See 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1); Rules 72, 6(a) and 6(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 72.2; Small v. Secretary of H.H.S. , 892 F.2d 15 (2d Cir. 1989) ( per curiam ); F.D.I.C. v. Hillcrest Assoc. , 66 F.3d 566, 569 (2d Cir. 1995). Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 10/5/18. (Dowie, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 10, 2018
17 17 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 08/10 3:08 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for Recommended Ruling on Amended Complaint SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/10/2018.(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/06 3:20 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against CMHA Emergency Winter Shelter, Connecticut Fair Housing Ctr, Friendship Service Center of New Britain Co., Gathering Place, Northwest CT YMCA, Prudence Crandall Center for Woman, St. Vincent De Paul, Susan B Anthony Project, United Way of Connecticut, filed by Julie Miller.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
15 15 order Order on Recommended Ruling Mon 08/06 12:18 PM
ORDER: Upon review, the9 Recommended Ruling is Affirmed, Adopted and Ratified. Plaintiff filed an "Objection to the Recommended Ruling". However, nothing in that filing addresses the issues identified in the Recommended Ruling. Even treating the Objection as a proposed Amended Complaint there continues to be no allegations. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 8/6/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
14 14 order Order on Motion for Order Fri 07/27 11:04 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion for Order. SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/27/2018. (Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
13 13 respm Objection Wed 07/25 4:00 PM
OBJECTION re9 RECOMMENDED RULING filed by Julie Miller. (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
12 12 2 pgs motion Order Wed 07/25 3:42 PM
MOTION to Participate in Electronic Filing by Julie Miller.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
11 11 notice Consent to Electronic Notice Wed 07/25 3:40 PM
Consent to Electronic Notice by Julie Miller (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Appearance Self Represented Party Wed 07/25 3:39 PM
Appearance Self Represented Party by Julie Miller (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
9 9 motion Recommended Ruling Tue 07/17 1:28 PM
RECOMMENDED RULING. For the reasons set forth in the attached Ruling, the Court recommends that the Complaint [Doc. #1] be DISMISSED, without prejudice to re-filing, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. §1915(e)(2)(B)(ii). This is a recommended ruling. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(1). Any objections to this recommended ruling must be filed with the Clerk of the Court within fourteen (14) days of being served with this order. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b)(2). Failure to object within fourteen (14) days will preclude appellate review. See 28 U.S.C. §636(b)(1); Rules 72, 6(a) and 6(d) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 72.2; Small v. Secretary of H.H.S. , 892 F.2d 15 (2d Cir. 1989) ( per curiam ); F.D.I.C. v. Hillcrest Assoc. , 66 F.3d 566, 569 (2d Cir. 1995). 6 Pages. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/17/18. (Tepe, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/17 1:20 PM
ORDER granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, along with a financial affidavit. See Doc. #2 . Plaintiff asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs. See id. at 2. Plaintiff states that she receives $219 in monthly government benefits. See id. at 3. Plaintiff states that she has $210 in monthly obligations. See Id. at 5. Plaintiff states that she does not own any real property. See id. at 3. These allegations are sufficient, at this stage, to establish that plaintiff "is unable to pay" the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. §1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 7/17/18. (Tepe, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
7 7 order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Wed 07/11 10:06 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam for motion including2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis SO ORDERED by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/11/2018.Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Lewis, D)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
6 6 1 pgs order Order Tue 07/10 2:47 PM
Standing Order re: Discovery Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/9/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Electronic Filing Order Tue 07/10 2:46 PM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/9/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Protective Order Tue 07/10 2:45 PM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Janet C. Hall on 7/9/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Tue 07/10 2:44 PM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/10/2018. Amended Pleadings due by 9/7/2018 Discovery due by 1/8/2019 Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2019 Signed by Clerk on 7/9/2018.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/10 2:42 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Julie Miller. (Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/10 2:37 PM
COMPLAINT against CMHA Emergency Winter Shelter, Connecticut Fair Housing Center, Friendship Service Center of New Britain Co., Gathering Place, Northwest CT YMCA, Prudence Crandall Center for Woman, St. Vincent De Paul, Susan B Anthony Project, United Way of Connecticut, Veyo Connecticut NEMT, filed by Julie Miller.(Anastasio, F.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope