Texas Northern District Court
Judge:Sam R Cummings
Case #: 5:18-cv-00159
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 09, 2018
Terminated:Jul 24, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Jan 05, 2019 3:26 AM CST
Defendant
City of Lubbock Municipal Court
Defendant
Greg Conner
Defendant
Ashley Ellis Dotson
Defendant
David Dyess
Defendant
Jorge E. Hernandez
Plaintiff
Keith Allen Kalka
General Delivery 411 Avenue L
Lubbock, TX 79408


Docket last updated: 8 hours ago
Friday, August 17, 2018
12 12 misc Supplemental Document Fri 08/17 2:33 PM
Supplemental Document by Keith Allen Kalka as to1 Complaint. (bmg)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 08/17 2:32 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address for Pro Se litigant Keith Allen Kalka. New address: General Delivery, 411 Avenue L, Lubbock, TX 79408. (bmg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
10 10 utility Mail Returned (Public Entry) Thu 08/02 1:58 PM
Mail returned as undeliverable.9 Judgment,8 Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure Terminate Motions received back from Keith Allen Kalka as RTS: Return to Sender. No address update from last filed document. The current document has not been re-mailed. (bmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 24, 2018
9 9 order Judgment Tue 07/24 9:34 AM
JUDGMENT: IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the above-styled and -numbered civil action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/24/2018) (bmg)
Related: [-]
8 8 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal or Administrative Closure ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 07/24 9:33 AM
ORDER: Denied7 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keith Allen Kalka. The Court finds that the Complaint fails to state a claim for which relief can be granted and/or seeks relief from a defendant to whom immunity would apply. Moreover, Plaintiff has failed to plead sufficient facts to invoke the jurisdiction of the Court. The Court is of the opinion that leave to proceed in forma pauperis must be DENIED and Plaintiff's Complaint must be DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Ordered by Senior Judge Sam R Cummings on 7/24/2018) (bmg)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Tue 07/24 9:35 AM
***Clerk's Notice of delivery: (see NEF for details) Docket No:8,9. Tue Jul 24 09:35:09 CDT 2018 (crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
7 7 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 07/10 4:32 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Keith Allen Kalka (bmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Additional Page(s)
6 6 misc Prisoner/Social Security Consent Tue 07/10 3:51 PM
Prisoner Consent by Keith Allen Kalka to Trial by Magistrate Judge. (bmg)
Related: [-]
5 5 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Tue 07/10 3:51 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Keith Allen Kalka re1 Complaint. (bmg)
Related: [-]
4 4 respm Brief/Memorandum In Support Tue 07/10 3:17 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Keith Allen Kalka re1 Complaint. (bmg)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
3 3 notice Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party Tue 07/10 8:29 AM
Notice and Instruction to Pro Se Party (bmg)
Related: [-]
2 2 qcref Cummings (West Texas) Tue 07/10 8:29 AM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has not been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge. Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (bmg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/10 8:27 AM
COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Keith Allen Kalka. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms, instructions, and exemption information may be found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (bmg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet Civil Case Coversheet