California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: Alexander F Mackinnon
Case #: 2:18-cv-05991
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
Cause26:7402 IRS: Petition to Enforce IRS Summons
Case Filed:Jul 10, 2018
Terminated:Aug 10, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jan 06, 2019 12:51 AM PST
Petitioner
United States of America
Represented By
James C Hughes
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info
Respondent
Amy Zimmerman


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 10, 2018
7 7 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Fri 08/10 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Petitioner United States of America. Dismissal is Without Pejudice. (Hughes, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 09, 2018
6 6 misc Status Report Thu 08/09 3:56 PM
STATUS REPORT Regarding Service of Process on Petitioner; Declaration of James C. Hughes filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Hughes, James)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Thu 08/09 3:52 PM
DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Petitioner United States of America, served on 8/9/2018. (Hughes, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 13, 2018
4 4 3 pgs order Order to Show Cause Fri 07/13 3:55 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Percy Anderson. Show Cause Hearing set for 10/1/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Percy Anderson. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 9/3/2018. (mrgo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 07/11 5:10 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Tue 07/10 12:15 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Hughes, James)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 07/10 12:11 PM
PETITION to Enforce Internal Revenue Service Summons; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declarations of Revenue Agent Christina Rikke and Revenue Agent Risha Finney in Support Thereof No Fee Required - US Government, filed by Petitioner United States of America. (Attorney James C Hughes added to party United States of America(pty:pet))(Hughes, James)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Christina Rikke,
Att: 2 Declaration of Risha Finney,
Att: 3 Proposed Order to Show Cause