Nodaway County, Missouri v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45795 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 5:18-cv-06085 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:11 PM EST |
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. n/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hy-Vee, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Nodaway County, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:33 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
NOTICE OF MAGISTRATE ASSIGNMENT. This is a docket entry only. No document is attached. Magistrate Return due by 7/5/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court. (Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of Nodaway County, Missouri. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5812680. Service due by 9/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to an outside mediator. (Woods, Gloria) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/13/2018) (Woods, Gloria). Modified on 6/13/2018 - replaced notice of inclusion due to incorrect case number. (Woods, Gloria). [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-CTO-42, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL No. 2804. Signed on July 6, 2018. Case electronically transferred. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western. Case number 5:18-cv-06085. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |