City of Saint Joseph, Missouri v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45798 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Western, 5:18-cv-06087 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:11 PM EST |
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Technology, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The P.F. Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. n/k/a Walgreen Co.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Saint Joseph, Missouri
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:05 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 13, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Thomas P. Cartmell on behalf of City of Saint Joseph, Missouri. Filing fee $400, receipt number AMOWDC-5813037. Service due by 9/11/2018 unless otherwise directed by the court.(Cartmell, Thomas) [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF INCLUSION FOR MEDIATION AND ASSESSMENT PROGRAM (MAP). REVIEW NOTICE AND MAP GENERAL ORDER CAREFULLY FOR IMPORTANT CHANGES, DEADLINES AND REQUIREMENTS. Notice of MAP assignment to Program Director.(Woods, Gloria) [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 MAP General Order | ||
Thursday, June 14, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 ADMINISTRATIVE TRANSFER. Due to a conflict of interest by the Honorable Ortrie D. Smith, this case has been randomly reassigned to the Honorable Stephen R. Bough for all further proceedings. Please note the new case number: 5 18-06087 CV-SJ-SRB. This is a TEXT ONLY ENTRY. No document is attached. (Jones, Robin) [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 MDL CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER, CTO-42, from Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel, transferring case to Northern District of Ohio to be included in MDL No. 2804. Signed on 7/6/2018. Case electronically transferred. (Melvin, Greg) [Transferred from mowd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Missouri Western. Case number 5:18-cv-06087. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |