Rowan County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45799 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 10, 2018 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Middle, 1:18-cv-00524 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:11 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnhson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Rowan County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:13 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
Case ASSIGNED to CHIEF JUDGE THOMAS D. SCHROEDER and MAGISTRATE JUDGE L. PATRICK AULD. (Coyne, Michelle) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/10/2018.] | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0418-2372960.), filed by ROWAN COUNTY.(COATES, PAUL) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-42) Re: MDL 2804 transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017. Received and filed on July 6, 2018. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/10/2018.] | |
3 | 3 MDL TRANFER LETTER to individual courts and counsel of record re: Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-42) transferring this action to the Northern District of Ohio. (Daniel, J) [Transferred from ncmd on 7/10/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Middle. Case number 1:18-cv-00524. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |