Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Jared C Bennett
Case #: 2:18-cv-00551
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1051 Trademark Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 11, 2018
Terminated:Sep 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Jan 07, 2019 1:56 AM MST
Counter Claimant
Pediatric Hair Solutions
Represented By
Geoffrey Kris Biehn
Magleby Cataxinos & Greenwood
contact info
Sarah E. Elsden
Lee & Hayes PLLC
contact info
Christine T. Greenwood
Magleby Cataxinos & Greenwood
contact info
Andrew G. Strickland
Lee & Hayes PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Larada Sciences
Represented By
Richard W. Miller
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Nathan R. Marigoni
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Alan White
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Jason D. Boren
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Pediatric Hair Solutions
Represented By
Geoffrey Kris Biehn
Magleby Cataxinos & Greenwood
contact info
Sarah E. Elsden
Lee & Hayes PLLC
contact info
Christine T. Greenwood
Magleby Cataxinos & Greenwood
contact info
Andrew G. Strickland
Lee & Hayes PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Larada Sciences
Represented By
Richard W. Miller
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Nathan R. Marigoni
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Alan White
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Jason D. Boren
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info

GPO Apr 20 2020
ORDER granting 48 Motion to Amend/Correct; granting 61 Motion for Leave to File. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 4/20/20. (jwt)
GPO Sep 03 2020
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 118 Motion to Dismiss: FloSonix's Motion is GRANTED and Larada's claims against FloSonix are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 9/3/20. (dla)
GPO Feb 16 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order granting 160 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 02/16/2023. (jl)
GPO Oct 10 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting in part and denying in part 192 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/10/23 (alt)
GPO Oct 10 2023
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 193 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Dr. James Rice. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 10/10/23 (alt)
GPO Mar 01 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER - granting in part and denying in part 224 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jared C. Bennett on 3/1/2024. (mh)
GPO May 13 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER denying 215 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 5/13/2024. (mh)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 19, 2025
389 389 misc Transcript Purchase Notice Wed 03/19 9:13 AM
Transcript Purchased by: Kaitlin Morgan re386 ,383 ,387 ,384 ,385 transcript(s) of 8/22/24,8/26/24,8/27/24 and 8/28/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
388 388 misc Transcript Purchase Notice Wed 03/19 9:10 AM
Transcript Purchased by: Douglas Smith re383 ,387 ,384 transcript(s) of 8/26/24,8/27/24 and 8/28/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
387 387 misc Transcript Wed 03/19 9:06 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held on August 26, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle Mallonee, RPR, CCR, Telephone number (801) 209-4979. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/9/2025. Redaction Request due 4/30/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
386 386 misc Transcript Wed 03/19 9:04 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Partial Transcript of Trial Proceedings Testimony of Sheila Fassler held on August 22, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle Mallonee, RPR, CCR, Telephone number (801) 209-4979. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/9/2025. Redaction Request due 4/30/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
385 385 misc Transcript Wed 03/19 9:01 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Partial Transcript of Trial Proceedings Testimony of Jon Beck held on August 22, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle Mallonee, RPR, CCR, Telephone number (801) 209-4979. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/9/2025. Redaction Request due 4/30/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
384 384 misc Transcript Wed 03/19 8:58 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held on August 27, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/9/2025. Redaction Request due 4/30/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
383 383 misc Transcript Wed 03/19 8:54 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial held on August 28, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle Mallonee, RPR, CCR, Telephone number (801) 209-4979. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/9/2025. Redaction Request due 4/30/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/17/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 18, 2025
382 382 misc Transcript Purchase Notice Tue 03/18 3:09 PM
Transcript Purchased by: Judge Shelby re381 transcript(s) of 8/29/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
381 381 misc Transcript Tue 03/18 3:07 PM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial-Volume 8 held on AUGUST 29, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Michelle B. Gonsalves, RPR, CRR, CBC, CSR, Telephone number 801-783-8657. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/8/2025. Redaction Request due 4/29/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/20/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/16/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
380 380 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 03/13 10:07 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION re:348 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Memorandum in Support ;359 Defendant's MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and Memorandum in Support (Partial) ;360 Defendant's MOTION for New Trial and Memorandum in Support and/or Remittitur ;369 Emergency MOTION to Stay re:344 Judgment: In Person Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2025 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3.100. (Notice generated by Mary Jane McNamee) (mjm)
Related: [-]
379 379 misc Transcript Purchase Notice Thu 03/13 9:25 AM
Transcript Purchased by: Douglas Smith, Peter Stasiewicz, Romaine Marshall, Jose Abarca re378 ,374 ,376 ,373 ,375 ,377 transcript(s) of 8/21/24 and 8/23/24. (jrj)
Related: [-]
378 378 misc Transcript Thu 03/13 9:10 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Trial Testimony of SHEILA FASSLER held on August 23, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/3/2025. Redaction Request due 4/24/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
377 377 misc Transcript Thu 03/13 9:06 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Trial Testimony of MATT GERMANE held on August 23, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/3/2025. Redaction Request due 4/24/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
376 376 misc Transcript Thu 03/13 9:01 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Trial Testimony of JOHN FASSLER held on August 23, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/3/2025. Redaction Request due 4/24/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
375 375 misc Transcript Thu 03/13 8:51 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Opening Statement of Douglas Smith held on August 21, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/3/2025. Redaction Request due 4/24/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
374 374 misc Transcript Thu 03/13 8:46 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Trial Testimony of CLAIRE ROBERTS held on August 21, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/3/2025. Redaction Request due 4/24/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]
373 373 misc Transcript Thu 03/13 8:39 AM
**RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Jury Trial Trial Testimony of JON BECK held on August 21, 2024 before Judge Robert J. Shelby. Court Reporter/Transcriber Ed Young, Telephone number 801-328-3202. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Please review the transcript within 14 days after receiving this notice to determine if personal data identifiers need to be redacted. If redaction is not required, the transcript will be made electronically available 90 days after this notice. If redaction of personal identifies is needed, a party must file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction within 21 days after receiving this notice. Within 42 days after receiving this notice, a party must file a Redaction Request identifying the information that must be redacted. Please review DUCivR 5.2-1 for additional information about redacting personal identifiers or protected information. The Attorney Filing the Notice of Intent To Request Redaction and Redaction request must send a copy to the court reporter. The court will not send a copy to the court reporter. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction due 4/3/2025. Redaction Request due 4/24/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/15/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/11/2025. (jrj)
Related: [-]