Town of Warren, Massachusetts, et al v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45811 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 4:18-cv-40092 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:13 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Warren, Massachusetts,
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7165037 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Warren, Massachusetts,.(Sandman, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/31/2018) (Burgos, Sandra). [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. District Judge Timothy S. Hillman assigned to case. (adminn, ) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Monday, June 04, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Burgos, Sandra) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 42 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-40090-TSH, 4:18-cv-40091-TSH, 4:18-cv-40092-TSH(Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 42 in MDL Case 2804 received from the Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. Associated Cases: 4:18-cv-40090-TSH, 4:18-cv-40091-TSH, 4:18-cv-40092-TSH(Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 4:18-cv-40092. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |