Town of Winthrop, Massachusetts v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45814 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 11, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 3:18-cv-30081 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:13 PM EST |
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Winthrop, Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:55 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7165220 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Winthrop, Massachusetts.(Sandman, Richard) (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/1/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice). [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
Friday, June 01, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICA, INC. n/k/a JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Purdue Pharma, L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The complaint (Dkt. No. 1) have been edited because the cover sheet was filed in its original fillable/interactive form without being converted to pdf as required. Under our CM/ECF Procedures all fillable forms must be converted to pdf before they are filed. (Lindsay, Maurice) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Friday, July 06, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 42 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Monday, July 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-42 in MDL Case 2804 received from District of Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Figueroa, Tamara) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
7 | 7 Case transferred to the District of Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 7/6/2018. Case sent electronically and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. (Figueroa, Tamara) [Transferred from mad on 7/11/2018.] | |
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 3:18-cv-30081. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |