Bon Secours Health System, Inc. et al v. PURDUE PHARMA, L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45820 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2018 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:13 PM EST |
Defendant
N. C. Mutual Wholesale Drug Co. a/k/a Mutual Drug
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Penn Veterinary Supply
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patterson Veterinary Supply Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patterson Logistics Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center LLC
|
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Pharmedium Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Miami-Luken, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
MWI Veterinary Supply
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
west-ward pharmaceuticals corp. k/n/a hikma pharmaceuticals, inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceutcals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Top Rx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Keysource Medical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Smith Drug Company a/k/a J M Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals
|
|
Defendant
RITE AID CORPORATION
30 HUNTER LN.
CAMP BILL, PA 17011 |
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L P
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Apotex Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Associated Pharmacies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Auburn Pharmaceutical Company
|
|
Defendant
Bedford Laboratories
|
|
Defendant
Bloodworth Wholesale Drugs, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ameridose, LLC
203 Flanders Road
Westborough, MA 01581 |
|
Defendant
American Sales Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Advantage Logistics
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cedardale Distributors LLC d/b/a Gen-Source Rx
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Collegium Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Depomed, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
ECR Pharmaceuticals Co., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Emergency Medical Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
ALLERGAN PLC, f/k/a ACTAVIS PLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Plaintiff
Bon Secours DePaul Medical Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bon Secours Health System, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bon Secours-Memorial Regional Medical Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bon Secours-Richmond Community Hospital, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bon Secours-St. Francis Medical Center, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bon Secours-St. Mary's Hospital of Richmond, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bon Secours-Virginia Healthsource, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Chesapeake Hospital Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Maryview Hospital
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mary Immaculate Hospital, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Patient First Corporation
Terminated: 08/20/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Midwest Veterinary Supply Inc.
Terminated: 06/28/2019
|
|
Defendant
Medisca Inc.
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
|
Defendant
ETHEX CORPORATION
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
|
Defendant
Hospira, Inc.
Terminated: 06/26/2019
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:14 PM EDT |