Berry Petroleum Company, LLC v. Hinkle et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Lead BK case is: 6:16-bk-60040
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 6:18-ap-06008 |
Nature of Suit | 91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 12, 2018 |
Terminated: | Jan 20, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Charles E. Hinkle
3131 McKinney Avenue Suite 100
Dallas, TX 75204 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
James H. Niven
3131 McKinney Avenue Suite 100
Dallas, TX 75204 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bianchi Family Ltd. Partnership
3131 McKinney Avenue Suite 100
Dallas, TX 75204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Berry Petroleum Company, LLC
5201 Truxtun Ave.
Bakersfield, CA 93309 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/03/2024 1:10 PM CDT |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
trustee
Remark (batch)
Tue 10/17 5:17 PM
Remark: Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. . (DawnaKelly) |
|
Thursday, January 31, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/31 11:59 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 01/31/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Sunday, January 20, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
3
pgs
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Tue 01/29 11:13 AM
Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Case Signed on 1/20/2019 (aalo) |
|
Tuesday, November 13, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
7
pgs
motion
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Tue 11/13 9:05 AM
Agreed Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding. Objections/Request for Hearing Due in 21 days. Filed by Berry Petroleum Company, LLC (Harrison, Julie) |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
3
pgs
misc
Stipulation
Tue 09/11 1:32 PM
Stipulation By Berry Petroleum Company, LLC and James H. Niven, Charles E. Hinkle, and Bianchi Family Ltd. Parnership. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? No. (Filed By Berry Petroleum Company, LLC ) (Harrison, Julie) |
|
Sunday, July 29, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/29 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/29/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 07/26 12:03 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/25/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
2
pgs
notice
Notice
Fri 07/20 9:03 AM
Notice of Exhibit A to Original Complaint . Filed by Berry Petroleum Company, LLC(Harrison, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 34 pgs Exhibit A | ||
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Generic Order
Fri 07/27 3:47 PM
Reorganized Berry Debtor's Motion to Consolidate Contested Matter with Adversary Proceeding Involving James H. Niven, Charles E. Hinkle, and Bianchi Family LTD. Partnership Signed on 7/18/2018 (VrianaPortillo) |
|
5 | 5
4
pgs
order
Generic Order
Mon 07/23 2:29 PM
Agreed Scheduling Order Signed on 7/18/2018 (VrianaPortillo) |
|
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/16 8:42 AM
Receipt of Complaint 18-06008 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 20207053. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
||
Sunday, July 15, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 07/15 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 4. Notice Date 07/15/2018. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, July 13, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 07/13 6:30 AM
|
|
Thursday, July 12, 2018 | ||
1 | 1
11
pgs
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 07/12 5:28 PM
Adversary case 18-06008 Nature of Suit: (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) Complaint by Berry Petroleum Company, LLC against Charles E. Hinkle, James H. Niven, Bianchi Family Ltd. Partnership. Fee Amount $350 (Harrison, Julie) |
|
Att: 1 2 pgs Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet |