Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:10-cv.pr-01125
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Feb 02, 2010
Terminated:Apr 13, 2010

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 3:36 AM EDT
Tuesday, February 02, 2010
1 1 3 pgs [Edited 02/02/2010 by BHR]. [Reason for edit: Docket Text Corrected]. Case docketed. Originating case numbers: 1:06-cv-00077-LO-TRJ,1:06-CV-00247-LO-TRJ,1:06-cv-00265-LO-TRJ,1:06-cv-00304-LO-TRJ,1:06-cv-01446-LO-TRJ, 1:07-cv-00296-LO-TRJ. Case manager: BarbaraRowe. Date notice of appeal filed: 01/21/2010 10-1125 BHR [Entered: 02/02/2010 03:52 PM]
Related: [-]