Fourth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:10-cv.pr-01150
Typecivil private / private
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Case Filed:Feb 08, 2010
Terminated:Apr 16, 2010

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/21/2025 3:36 AM EDT
Monday, February 08, 2010
1 1 3 pgs Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:06-cv-00077-LO-TRJ. Case manager: BarbaraRowe. Date notice of appeal filed: 02/02/2010 10-1150 BHR [Entered: 02/08/2010 10:35 AM]
Related: [-]
2 2 4 pgs DOCKETING NOTICE issued. Re: [1],case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:06-cv-00077-LO-TRJ. 10-1150 BHR [Entered: 02/08/2010 11:25 AM]
Related: [-]
3 3 FEE NOTICE issued to Daniel Rocker - initial notice. Fee or application to proceed as indigent due 02/23/2010 Originating case number: 1:06-cv-00077-LO-TRJ. 10-1150 BHR [Entered: 02/08/2010 11:37 AM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs form(s) sent
Att: 2 1 pgs
4 4 1 pgs NOTICE ISSUED to Daniel Rocker and Jeffrey Alan Barrack, Chad A. Carder, Jeffrey Warren Golan, Laura Gundersheim, Lisa M. Lamb, Julie Goldsmith Reiser, Hannah Greenwald Ross, Steven Bennett Singer, Daniel S. Sommers and Steven J. Toll in 10-1150 Kenneth R. Parent and Paul C. Berkey, Irwin Berlin, Charles R. Black, Jr., James C. Braithwaite, City of Miami General Employees' and Sanitation Employees' Retirement Trust, Commonwealth of Massachusetts Pension Reserves Investment Trust, James F. Dausch, Frederic Elliott, C. Bickley Foster, Joseph B. Gildenhorn, John M. Ingram, Iowa Public Employees' Retirement System, Nicholas McDonough, Merrill Lynch Pierce Fenner and Smith Incorporated, Morgan Stanley & Company, Incorporated, Mary Jane Morrow, Harry H. Nick, Palisades Capital Management LLC, Robert P. Pincus, Public Employees' Retirement System of Mississippi, RBC Capital Markets Corporation, Christina L. Rose, Vernon E. Rudolph, Lawrence C. Siegel, The Mills Corporation, The Mills Limited Partnership, Wachovia Capitol Markets LLC, Dietrich von Boetticher and Franz Freiherr von Perfall in 10-1125 requesting response to court inquiry [998274348]. 10-1150 10-1125 BHR [Entered: 02/08/2010 11:47 AM]
Related: [-]