Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:Ronald A White
Case #: 6:18-cv-00220
Nature of Suit367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jul 13, 2018
Terminated:Mar 07, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 09, 2019 2:58 AM CST
Defendant
Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC
Represented By
Amy D. White
Phillips Murrah, PC
contact info
Ashley M. Schovanec
Phillips Murrah, PC
contact info
G. Calvin Sharpe
Phillips Murrah, PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Hearod
Represented By
Jeremy Beaver
Gotcher And Beaver
contact info
Warren Gotcher
Gotcher And Beaver
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CVS Health
Terminated: 11/01/2018
Represented By
Amy D. White
Phillips Murrah, PC
contact info
Ashley M. Schovanec
Phillips Murrah, PC
contact info
G. Calvin Sharpe
Phillips Murrah, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, March 07, 2019
48 48 order 01 - Order Case - Administratively Closed Thu 03/07 2:42 PM
JUDGMENT DISMISSING ACTION BY REASON OF SETTLEMENT by Judge Ronald A. White: administratively closing the case (case terminated) (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
47 47 minutes 32 - Settlement Conference Held Thu 03/07 12:45 PM
MINUTES of Settlement Conference held on 3/7/2019 before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder: Plaintiff Michael Hearod was present and represented by counsel Warren Gotcher. Defendant Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC was present by and through Pharmacy Manager Nullacia Willayi, and was represented by counsel Calvin Sharpe. Conference concluded WITH settlement. (tmb, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
46 46 order Ruling on Motion to Amend Tue 03/05 11:16 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting plaintiff's Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Witness List and Exhibit List filed 2/14/2019 (38 Motion to Amend). (lal, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 28, 2019
45 45 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/28 2:44 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion Related [+] by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC ;(Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-] 38 MOTION to Amend Plaintiff's Witness List and Exhibit List
44 44 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Thu 02/28 8:44 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White RESETTING Pretrial Conference from 3/21/2019 at 4:00 PM to 3/21/2019 at 10:30 AM (TIME CHANGE ONLY) in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
43 43 order Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/26 11:30 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White denying plaintiff's Motion Regarding Sufficiency of Objection to Requests for Admission and to Deem Requests Admitted filed 2/25/2019 (42 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief ). (lal, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
42 42 motion Miscellaneous Relief Mon 02/25 10:39 AM
MOTION determine objections filed by the Defendant to requests for admissions of Plaintiff be ruled insufficient and the requests be deemed admitted by Michael Hearod (With attachments) Responses due by 3/11/2019(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 22, 2019
41 41 motion Supplement Fri 02/22 11:38 AM
MOTION to Supplement Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Witness List and Exhibit List by Michael Hearod Responses due by 3/8/2019(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 21, 2019
40 40 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/21 5:18 PM
RESPONSE to Motion Related [+] by Michael Hearod ;(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION in Limine
Tuesday, February 19, 2019
39 39 order 02 - Minute Order Documents - Link to Document(s) Tue 02/19 3:28 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing plaintiff to supplement as to any objection by defendant as to his Motion to Amend Plaintiff's Witness List and Exhibit List filed 2/14/2019 Related [+] no later than 2/22/2019 to comply with >Local Civil Rule 7.1.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] 38 MOTION to Amend
Thursday, February 14, 2019
38 38 motion Amend/Correct Thu 02/14 2:56 PM
MOTION to Amend by Michael Hearod (With attachments) Responses due by 2/28/2019(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
37 37 respm Response to Motion Thu 02/14 2:08 PM
RESPONSE to Motion Related [+] by Michael Hearod ;(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-] 34 MOTION in Limine
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
36 36 order Ruling on Motion to Strike Document(s) Tue 02/12 9:50 AM
MINTUE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White denying32 Defendant, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy LLC's Motion to Strike Plaintiff's Final Expert Witness List. (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
35 35 respm Response to Motion Mon 02/11 11:06 AM
RESPONSE to Motion Related [+] by Michael Hearod ;(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-] 32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Final Expert Witness List
Friday, February 08, 2019
34 34 motion In Limine Fri 02/08 4:39 PM
MOTION in Limine with Brief in Support by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 2/22/2019(White, Amy)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 06, 2019
33 33 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset All Motion and R&R Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Wed 02/06 10:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing Plaintiff to file an expedited response to32 MOTION to Strike Plaintiff's Final Expert Witness List by 2/12/2019 (dma, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 05, 2019
32 32 motion Strike Document(s) Tue 02/05 2:59 PM
MOTION to Strike Document(s) Plaintiff's Final Expert Witness List Related [+] by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC Responses due by 2/19/2019(Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-] 31 Expert Witness List
Friday, February 01, 2019
31 31 trial Witness List - Expert Fri 02/01 4:13 PM
EXPERT WITNESS LIST by Michael Hearod (Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Expert Witness Report Fri 02/01 11:35 AM
Final EXPERT WITNESS REPORT Final List of Expert Witnesses-In-Chief by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC (With attachments)(White, Amy)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 11, 2019
29 29 notice Notice of Deposition Fri 01/11 10:26 AM
NOTICE of Deposition by Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 02, 2019
28 28 trial Witness List Wed 01/02 3:06 PM
WITNESS LIST by CVS Health, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-]
27 27 trial Exhibit List Wed 01/02 3:05 PM
EXHIBIT LIST by CVS Health, Oklahoma CVS Pharmacy, LLC (Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-]
26 26 trial Witness List Wed 01/02 2:23 PM
WITNESS LIST by Michael Hearod (Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
25 25 trial Exhibit List Wed 01/02 2:22 PM
EXHIBIT LIST by Michael Hearod (Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 01, 2018
24 24 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 11/01 4:46 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal, dismissing CVS Health, f/k/a CVS Caremark Corporation, d/b/a CVS Pharmacy Store #10275, its subsidiaries and affiliated corporations, by Michael Hearod (Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 22, 2018
23 23 order 13 - Settlement Conference Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Mon 10/22 4:14 PM
SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: Settlement Conference set for 3/7/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Settlement Conference Statements due 2/21/2019. (tmb, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 18, 2018
22 22 order 05 - Scheduling Order Fri 10/19 3:12 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White setting scheduling order date(s) to include the following : Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2018 ; Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2018 ; Exhibit List due by 1/2/2019 ; Witness List due by 1/2/2019 ; Dispositive Motions due by 2/1/2019 ; Discovery due by 2/8/2019 ; Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 3/14/2019 ; Proposed Pretrial Order due by 3/14/2019 ; Pretrial Conference set for 3/21/2019 at 04:00 PM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White ; and Jury Trial set for 4/2/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 2, Room 224, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
21 21 minutes 31 - Scheduling Conference Held Fri 10/19 3:04 PM
MINUTES of Proceedings - held before Judge Ronald A. White: Status and Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2018 (lal, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 17, 2018
20 20 notice Appearance - Attorney Wed 10/17 2:28 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Warren Gotcher on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 21, 2018
19 19 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Fri 09/21 4:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White RESETTING Status and Scheduling Conference for 10/18/2018 at 10:30 AM in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White.(lal, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
18 18 order Ruling on Motion to Continue Hearing(s) Wed 09/19 1:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White: finding as moot17 Plaintiff's Amended Motion to Continue. The motion has been granted. (cjt, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 18, 2018
17 17 motion Continue Hearing(s) Tue 09/18 11:22 AM
Amended MOTION to Continue Hearing(s) by Michael Hearod Responses due by 10/2/2018(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Ruling on Motion to Continue Hearing(s) Deadlines - Strike/Terminate Deadline(s)/Hearing(s) Tue 09/18 11:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White granting plaintiff's Motion to Continue filed 9/17/2018 (14 Motion to Continue Hearing(s). Accordingly, the Status and Scheduling Conference previously set for 9/19/2018 at 10:30 AM is STRICKEN to be reset at a later date. Additionally, counsel are reminded that discovery is not stayed and should be ongoing pursuant to the Court's previous order dated 7/19/2018. (lal, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Appearance - Attorney Tue 09/18 11:11 AM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Ashley M. Schovanec on behalf of CVS Health (Schovanec, Ashley)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 17, 2018
14 14 motion Continue Hearing(s) Mon 09/17 2:12 PM
MOTION to Continue Hearing(s) by Michael Hearod Responses due by 10/1/2018(Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
13 13 order 02 - Minute Order Deadlines - Set/Reset Hearing(s) Tue 09/04 2:43 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White setting Scheduling Conference for 9/19/18 at 10:30 a.m. in Chambers, Room 227, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Judge Ronald A. White (dma, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
12 12 misc Joint Status Report per Local Rule 16.1 Mon 08/20 3:14 PM
JOINT STATUS REPORT by CVS Health (White, Amy)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Mon 08/20 3:12 PM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by CVS Health (White, Amy)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosures per FRCP 26 Mon 08/20 11:34 AM
DISCLOSURES per FRCP 26 by Michael Hearod (Gotcher, Warren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement (Corporate) Wed 07/25 11:47 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT (identifying: Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc. for CVS Health) by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 19, 2018
8 8 order 01 - Order Directing - Parties to File Joint Status Report Thu 07/19 3:15 PM
ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White directing parties to file their Disclosures and Joint Status Report no later than 8/20/2018 (tls, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 18, 2018
7 7 order 02 - Minute Order Case - Reassigned Wed 07/18 4:25 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to Judge Ronald A. White. Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 18-220-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 answer Answer to State Court Petition/Complaint Wed 07/18 11:07 AM
ANSWER with Jury Demand to Petition/Complaint filed in State Court Related [+] by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Friday, July 13, 2018
5 5 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 07/13 1:51 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by G. Calvin Sharpe on behalf of CVS Health (Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Appearance - Attorney Fri 07/13 1:50 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Amy D. White on behalf of CVS Health (White, Amy)
Related: [-]
3 3 order 02 - Minute Order Directing - New CV Notice of Removal Case Filing Fee Payment Fri 07/13 11:20 AM
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 7/20/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Removal Fri 07/13 11:15 AM
NOTICE of Removal from Pittsburg County District Court, case number 18-CJ-139 by CVS Health (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 07/13 11:13 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET by CVS Health (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
misc Filing Fee Paid in Full - CV Fri 07/13 2:35 PM
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/13/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1191598 Related [+] by CVS Health (Sharpe, G.)
Related: [-] 2 Notice of Removal
Friday, June 22, 2018
cmp State Court Petition/Complaint Fri 07/13 11:18 AM
PETITION filed in State Court against CVS Health by Michael Hearod (pjw, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]