New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00423
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2018
Terminated:Feb 03, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 14, 2018 3:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Fatima Woods (1)
Represented By
Thomas Hamilton Nooter
Freeman Nooter & Ginsberg
contact info
Barry S Zone
Moses & Singer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jessica Greenwood
United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/02/2022 2:38 PM EDT
Wednesday, May 16, 2018
Arrest of Fatima Woods. (dif) Modified on 5/21/2018 (dif). [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 17, 2018
Attorney update in case as to Fatima Woods. Attorney Thomas Hamilton Nooter for Fatima Woods added.. (dif) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs COMPLAINT as to Fatima Woods. In Violation of 21 U.S.C. 846 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses) (dif) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Fatima Woods. (Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses) (CJA Attorney Thomas Nooter Appointed) (dif) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses: Initial Appearance as to Fatima Woods held on 5/17/2018., Deft Appears with CJA Attorney Thomas Nooter and AUSA Jessica Greenwood for the government. AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE: $200,000 PRB; 2 FRP'S; Secured by Property: All Equity in Deft's Home in Totowa, NJ; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY and District of New Jersey; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Deft to Submit to Urinalysis, If Positive, Add Condition of Drug Testing/Treatment; Home Incarceration; Electronic Monitoring; Deft to Be Released on Own Signature; Remaining Conditions to Be Met by: See Below; Deft to Be Released Upon PTS Inspection of Deft's Apartment and Electronic Monitoring Set Up; FRP'S to Sign by 5/31/18; Property To Be Posted by 6/14/18; Deft Not to Possess ID Documents in Anyone Else's Name; ( Preliminary Hearing set for 6/18/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (dif) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
4 4 AGREEMENT TO FORFEIT REAL PROPERTY by Fatima Woods. Personal Recognizance Bond in the amount of $ 200,000 PRB, 2 FRP'S; Secured by Property: All Equity in Deft's Home in Totowa, NJ; Travel Limited to SDNY/EDNY; Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision; Deft to Submit to Urinalysis, If Positive, Add Condition of Drug Testing/Treatment; Deft to Be Released on Own Signature; Remaining Conditions to Be Met by; See Below; Deft to Be Released Upon PTS Inspection of Deft's Apartment and Electronic Monitoring Set Up; FRP'S to Sign by 5/31/18; Property To Be Posted by 6/14/18; Def Not to Possess ID Documents in Anyone Else's Name (dif) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 21, 2018
5 5 3 pgs ORDER MODIFYING CONDITIONS OF RELEASE as to Fatima Woods. The following modifications to the bail set on May 17, 2018 by USMJ Barbara Moses as follows: (1) The defendant may be released upon the signing of the bond by the defendant and two financially responsible persons approved by the Government, and (2) The Defendant will be supervised on home incarceration with electronic monitoring by US PTS Electronic Monitoring Unit until such time in the District of New Jersey (which is the District of the Defendant's residence) can set up a home-incarceration electronic monitoring system in the defendant's residence, whereupon the defendant will be continued on home incarceration as previously ordered. During the time the defendant is being supervised she is directed to remain in home except as permitted by PTS for personal emergencies, or visits to her attorney's office upon reasonable notice to PTS. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/21/2018)(dif) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 13, 2018
6 6 ENDORSED LETTER as to Fatima Woods addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from defense counsel Thomas Nooter dated 6/13/18 re: requesting that the Court approve a modification of the bail conditions in this case to extend the date for the filing of the lien against the property until June 26, 2018. ENDORSEMENT: Granted on consent. (Per the Court's law clerks conversation with Ms. Greenwood). (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 6/13/18)(jbo) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 14, 2018
Case Designated ECF as to Fatima Woods. (bw)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs LETTER by USA as to Fatima Woods addressed to Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein from AUSA Jessica Greenwood dated 6/14/18 re: The Government writes in response to the defendant's June 13, 2018 letter requesting a bail modification to allow for an additional 12 days to satisfy the bail conditions of posting a particular property. The Government does not object to this request. Document filed by USA. (jbo) [1:18-mj-04256-UA]
Related: [-]
8 8 4 pgs INDICTMENT FILED as to Fatima Woods (1) count(s) 1. (bw)
Related: [-]