City of Hartselle, Alabama v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45736 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 15, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Alabama Northern, 5:18-cv-00805 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:14 PM EST |
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
The Kroger Co.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Hartselle, Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:29 PM EDT |
Friday, May 25, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Allergan PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco Inc, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma Inc, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, filed by City of Hartselle, Alabama.(KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 6/15/2018.] | |
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/5/2018. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 6/15/2018.] | |
Tuesday, June 12, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 TEXT ORDER: To date, the plaintiff has failed to pay the fee required to file a complaint with the Court. The Court DIRECTS the plaintiff to pay the filing fee or seek leave to proceed in forma pauperis by 5 p.m. on Friday, June 15, 2018 . Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 6/12/2018. (YMB) [Transferred from alnd on 6/15/2018.] | |
Friday, June 15, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Ohio Northern for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically transferred to Clerk of Court in District of Ohio Northern. (KEK) [Transferred from alnd on 6/15/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Northern. Case number 5:18-cv-00805. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |