California Central District Court
Judge:Dale S Fischer
Referred: Gail J Standish
Case #: 2:18-cv-06077
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jul 12, 2018
Terminated:Aug 31, 2018
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 08, 2019 1:03 AM PST
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Jose Velez
3936 South Semoran Boulevard Apt 317
Orlando, FL 32822
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ian Mcphee
Terminated: 08/31/2018
Defendant
June Mcphee
Terminated: 08/31/2018


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, August 31, 2018
9 9 3 pgs notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)) Fri 08/31 12:50 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Jose Velez. as to Jose Velez of Complaint. Dismissal With prejudice. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bp)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
8 8 6 pgs adr Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) Mon 07/16 3:44 PM
Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (dp)
Related: [-]
7 7 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 07/16 3:31 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (dp)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 07/16 12:43 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendant Ian Mcphee. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 07/16 12:42 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery)1 as to Defendant June Mcphee. (et)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
4 4 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 07/16 12:41 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 07/16 12:40 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (et)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Mon 07/16 12:39 PM
CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jose Velez. (et)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Mon 07/16 11:52 AM
COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND DAMAGES against Defendants Ian Mcphee, June Mcphee, Does 1-10, inclusive. Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (Filing fee $ 400 PAID.), filed by Plaintiff Jose Velez. (et)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet