Evans Memorial Hospital, Inc. v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45826 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 17, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Georgia Southern, 6:18-cv-00070 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:14 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Evans Memorial Hospital, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10/01/2019 9:34 AM EDT |
Friday, June 22, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 241 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Evans Memorial Hospital, Inc.(trb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 113J-2399251. (trb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/17/2018.] | ||
2 | 2 GENERAL ORDER: Report of Rule 26(f) planning meeting. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 6/25/18. (trb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/17/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Litigants' Bill of Rights | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (trb) [Transferred from gasd on 7/17/2018.] | |
Monday, July 16, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-43) re1 Complaint filed by Evans Memorial Hospital, Inc. Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel on 7/16/18. (wwp) [Transferred from gasd on 7/17/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 17, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Georgia Southern. Case number 6:18-cv-00070. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |