Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:18-cr-00512
Case Filed:Jul 17, 2018
Last checked: Thursday Jul 19, 2018 2:19 AM CDT
Defendant
Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra (3)
Represented By
Luis Antonio Figueroa
Attorney At Law
contact info
Defendant
Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez (1)
Represented By
Francisco Javier Montemayor, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
J Alberto Alarcon
Hall Quintanilla Et Al
contact info
Defendant
Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez (2)
Represented By
Jose M Rubio, Jr
J.M. Rubio, Jr
contact info
Material Witness
Jesus Meliton Luna-Gonzalez
Represented By
Derly J Uribe
Law Offices Of Francisco J. Saldana Jr
contact info
Material Witness
Marvin Josue Membreno-Osorio
Represented By
Derly J Uribe
Law Offices Of Francisco J. Saldana Jr
contact info
Material Witness
Emilson Ariel Sanchez-Mejia
Represented By
Derly J Uribe
Law Offices Of Francisco J. Saldana Jr
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Giselle S. Guerra
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/19/2018 3:12 AM CDT
Friday, June 29, 2018
Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga assigned and added. (kjohnsonadi, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Case unsealed as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
1 1 Proposed COMPLAINT as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez (1), Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez (2), Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra (3), filed. (Webb) Probable Cause review set for 7/2/2018 at 05:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. Initial Appearance set for 7/2/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga (kjohnsonadi, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed.(kjohnsonadi, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
3 3 Proposed Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Emilson Ariel Sanchez-Mejia, Jesus Meliton Luna-Gonzalez as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 7/2/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga, filed.(kjohnsonadi, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
4 4 FINDING OF PROBABLE CAUSE ON STATEMENT on June 29, 2018 at 08:48 PM as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. Initial Appearance set for 7/2/2018 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 02, 2018
Attorney update in case as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. Attorney Luis Antonio Figueroa for Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra added. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra held on 7/2/2018. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Private attorney appointed: Luis Figueroa (not present in courtroom). Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Appearances: Jose Angel Moreno, AUSA; Luis Figueroa, appointed; USPTO: Julio Taboada; USPO: Patricia Albridez; USM: Deputy Torres. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:57 AM - 10:23 AM) (ERO: Ben Mendoza) (Interpreter: Zeph Pease, used) Defendant remanded to custody Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez. Attorney J Alberto Alarcon for Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez added. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez held on 7/2/2018. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Private attorney appointed: Alberto Alarcon (not present in courtroom). Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Appearances: Jose Angel Moreno, AUSA; Alberto Alarcon, appointed; USPTO: Julio Taboada; USPO: Patricia Albridez; USM: Deputy Torres. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:57 AM - 10:22 AM) (ERO: Ben Mendoza) (Interpreter: Zeph Pease, used) Defendant remanded to custody Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Attorney update in case as to Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez. Attorney Jose M Rubio, Jr for Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez added. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. INITIAL APPEARANCE on Complaint as to Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez held on 7/2/2018. Defendant advised of charge(s) and rights. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Private attorney appointed: Joe Rubio (not present in courtroom). Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing. No bond set. Appearances: Jose Angel Moreno, AUSA; Joe Rubio, appointed; USPTO: Julio Taboada; USPO: Patricia Albridez; USM: Deputy Torres. (Opened/Adjourned: 9:57 AM - 10:22 AM) (ERO: Ben Mendoza) (Interpreter: Zeph Pease, used) Defendant remanded to custody Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
5 5 COMPLAINT accepted by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed. Agent: Edgar Flores (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER on Material Witness Affidavit. The material witness(es) are committed to the custody of the U.S. Marshal's Service on a $25,000 cash or surety bond, pending disposition of this case. Agent: Edgar Flores (Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, filed. (nortiz, 5). [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez. J Alarcon appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
9 9 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
10 10 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez. Detention Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
11 11 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, filed. (nortiz, 5). [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez. Jose Rubio appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
13 13 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
14 14 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez. Detention Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
15 15 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed. (nortiz, 5). [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Defendant Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. Luis Figueroa appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF SETTING as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. Preliminary Examination Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
18 18 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. Detention Hearing set for 7/10/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2B before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
19 19 Letter sent to Consulate General of Honduras re Emilson Ariel Sanchez-Mejia, Material Witness in case as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed. (cdomadi, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
20 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Emilson Ariel Sanchez-Mejia as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 7/2/2018. Material Witness first appearance. Material Witness advised of charges and rights. Material Witness advised that no charges are pending and that Material Witness is detained in case number 5:18-MJ-640 USA vs Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, et.al. Financial Affidavit, executed. Material Witness requested appointed counsel. Private Attorney, appointed. Next on list: Derly Uribe (not present in courtroom). Bond set at $25,000.00 c/s. Appearances:Jose Angel Moreno, AUSA.(ERO: Ben Mendoza) (Interpreter: Zeph Pease, used) Material Witness remanded to custody, filed.(nortiz, 5) Modified on 7/2/2018 (nortiz, 5). [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
21 21 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Material Witness Emilson Ariel Sanchez-Mejia as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed. [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): EMILSON ARIEL SANCHEZ-MEJIA. DERLY URIBE appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (nortiz, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Jesus Meliton Luna-Gonzalez as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 7/2/2018. Material Witness first appearance. Material Witness advised of charges and rights. Material Witness advised that no charges are pending and that Material Witness is detained in case number 5:18-MJ-640 USA vs Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, et.al. Financial Affidavit, executed. Material Witness requested appointed counsel. Private Attorney, appointed. Next on list: Derly Uribe (not present in courtroom). Bond set at $25,000.00 c/s. Appearances: Jose Angel Moreno, AUSA.(ERO: Ben Mendoza) (Interpreter: Zeph Pease, used) Material Witness remanded to custody, filed.(nortiz, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
24 24 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Material Witness Jesus Meliton Luna-Gonzalez as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed. [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
25 25 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): JESUS MELITON LUNA-GONZALEZ. DERLY URIBE appointed. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (nortiz, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 09, 2018
26 26 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, filed.(Rubio, Jose) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
27 27 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, filed.(Rubio, Jose) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
28 28 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
29 29 MOTION to Substitute Attorney Francisco Javier Montemayor, Jr by Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, filed.(Montemayor, Francisco) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order
30 30 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, filed.(Montemayor, Francisco) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 10, 2018
**Terminate Prelim and Detention Deadlines and Hearings as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra: Waivers filed. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
**Terminate Prelim and Detention Deadlines and Hearings as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez: Waiver of Prelim and Detention were filed. Court granted Motion to Sub. Attorney Montemayor is now the attorney of record. (10:50-10:53) (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
31 31 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
32 32 ORDER granting29 Motion to Substitute Attorney Javier Montemayor for Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez replacing Attorney Alberto Alarcon as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.) Parties notified.(nortiz, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
33 33 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing by Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed.(nortiz, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
34 34 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed.(nortiz, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
35 35 WAIVER of Detention Hearing by Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, filed.(nortiz, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
36 36 Order of Detention Pending Trial as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (cdom, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 11, 2018
37 37 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed. (hcortez, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
38 38 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, filed. (mrperez, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
39 39 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, filed. (mrperez, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 12, 2018
40 40 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Marvin Josue Membreno-Osorio as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed.(vcantu, 5) [5:18-mj-00640]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 16, 2018
46 46 MAIL RETURNED UNDELIVERABLE re:19 sent to Consulate General of Hounduras as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra, filed. (mxperez, 5)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 17, 2018
42 42 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez (1) count(s) 1, 2-4, 5, Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez (2) count(s) 1, 2-4, Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra (3) count(s) 1, 2-4, filed. (vcantu, 5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
43 43 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Carlos Maldonado-Vazquez. Arraignment set for 7/26/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/6/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga ( Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified. (vcantu, 5)
Related: [-]
44 44 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Elizabeth Soto-Fernandez. Arraignment set for 7/26/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/6/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga ( Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified. (vcantu, 5)
Related: [-]
45 45 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Baltazar Cruz Ibarra-Visagra. Arraignment set for 7/26/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge John A Kazen Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/6/2018. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga ( Signed by Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo) Parties notified. (vcantu, 5)
Related: [-]