Town of Leverett, Massachusetts v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45836 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 3:18-cv-30083 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:15 PM EST |
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Leverett, Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 6:12 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 05, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7171432 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Leverett, Massachusetts.(Sandman, Richard) Modified to correct town name to "Leverett" on 6/6/2018 (Bartlett, Timothy). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/7/2018) (Lindsay, Maurice). [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
Thursday, June 07, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Lindsay, Maurice) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Notice of correction to docket made by Court staff. The complaint (Dkt. No. 1) have been edited because the category sheet was filed in its original fillable/interactive form without being converted to pdf as required. Under our CM/ECF Procedures all fillable forms must be converted to pdf before they are filed. (Lindsay, Maurice) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 40 in MDL Case 2804 received the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
6 | 6 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-40 in MDL Case 2804 received from District of Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Figueroa, Tamara) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
7 | 7 Case transferred to the Northern District of Ohio pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 06/25/2018. Case sent electronically and copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent to the Clerk in that district. (Figueroa, Tamara) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 3:18-cv-30083. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |