City of Newburyport v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45837 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 18, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:18-cv-11017 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:15 PM EST |
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Plaintiff
City of Newburyport
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:47 PM EDT |
Friday, May 18, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7146463 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by City of Newburyport.(Sandman, Richard) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Coppola, Katelyn) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergan plc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (McDonagh, Christina) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Friday, June 08, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number (CTO 36) in MDL Case MDL Case 2804 received from District of District of Ohio Northern requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Russo, Noreen) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Monday, June 11, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 36 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Monday, July 02, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 6/8/2018 case file electronically transferred to the Clerk in that District. (Russo, Noreen) [Transferred from mad on 7/18/2018.] | |
Wednesday, July 18, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:18-cv-11017. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |