Neshoba County, Mississippi v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45843 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Mississippi Southern, 3:18-cv-00423 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:16 PM EST |
Defendant
Morris & Dickson Co., LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
WALMART INC. F/K/A WALMART STORES, INC
|
|
Defendant
WALGREENS BOOTS ALLIANCE INC.
|
|
Defendant
The Harvard Drug Group, L.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
J. M. Smith Corp
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergen PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Neshoba County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 7:50 PM EDT |
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Allergen PLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0538-3747186), filed by Neshoba County, Mississippi.(KNS) [Transferred from mssd on 7/19/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Letter from USDC Clerk to J. Luthi, Clerk of MDL Panel attaching copy of Docket Sheet and Complaint. (KNS) [Transferred from mssd on 7/19/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO 44) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio filed 07/19/18. (KNS) [Transferred from mssd on 7/19/2018.] | |
4 | 4 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER: transferring this case to the Northern District of Ohio. Filed 07/19/18. (KNS) [Transferred from mssd on 7/19/2018.] | |
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Mississippi Southern. Case number 3:18-cv-00423. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |