Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Florida Middle District Court | |
Judge: | Thomas G Wilson |
Referred: | Thomas G Wilson |
Case #: | 8:18-cv-01765 |
Nature of Suit | 864 Social Security - SSID Title XVI |
Cause | 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID) |
Case Filed: | Jul 19, 2018 |
Terminated: | Sep 16, 2019 |
Create an account to get the full party report for this case.
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, September 16, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
order
Judgment
Mon 09/16 12:05 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Nadine Williams against Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 9/16/2019. (JNB) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
11
pgs
order
Opinion and order
Mon 09/16 10:56 AM
OPINION AND ORDER reversing the decision of the Commissioner and remanding for further proceedings. The Clerk is directed to enter judgment in accordance with this Order and close this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 9/13/2019. (DMS) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
respoth
Memorandum social security - defendant
Thu 02/07 4:12 PM
MEMORANDUM in support of the Commissioner's decision filed by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
Thursday, December 13, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
respoth
Memorandum social security - plaintiff
Thu 12/13 1:28 PM
MEMORANDUM in opposition to the Commissioner's decision filed by Nadine Williams. (Zadel, Bartholomew) |
|
Wednesday, October 17, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/17 4:40 PM
ORDER approving consent to jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 10/17/2018. (TWL) |
|
12 | 12
order
Scheduling Order - Social Security
Wed 10/17 1:24 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Plaintiff memorandum due in 60 days. Defendant memorandum due in 120 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas G. Wilson on 10/17/2018. (DMS) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Social security transcript
Wed 10/17 7:15 AM
SOCIAL security transcript of administrative proceedings re9 Answer to Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Att: 1 Appendix, | ||
Att: 2 Appendix, | ||
Att: 3 Appendix, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix, | ||
Att: 5 Appendix, | ||
Att: 6 Appendix, | ||
Att: 7 Appendix, | ||
Att: 8 Appendix, | ||
Att: 9 Appendix, | ||
Att: 10 Appendix, | ||
Att: 11 Appendix, | ||
Att: 12 Appendix, | ||
Att: 13 Appendix, | ||
Att: 14 Appendix | ||
10 | 10
misc
Consent to jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge
Wed 10/17 7:10 AM
CONSENT to trial by U.S. Magistrate Judge by Commissioner of Social Security. (Rudy, John) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 10/17 7:09 AM
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Commissioner of Social Security.(Rudy, John) |
|
Friday, October 12, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
service
Proof of service
Fri 10/12 5:05 PM
PROOF of service by Nadine Williams(Zadel, Bartholomew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
7 | 7
service
Proof of service
Fri 10/12 5:04 PM
PROOF of service by Nadine Williams(Zadel, Bartholomew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons returned executed as to USA
Fri 10/12 5:03 PM
SUMMONS returned executed by Nadine Williams. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/21/2018, answer due 10/22/2018.(Zadel, Bartholomew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of pendency of related cases
Thu 07/26 5:15 PM
NOTICE of pendency of related cases re4 Related case order and track 1 notice per Local Rule 1.04(d) by Nadine Williams. Related case(s): yes (Zadel, Bartholomew) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
order
Related case order and track 1 notice
Mon 07/23 8:16 AM
RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 1. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 7/23/2018. (SAO) |
|
Thursday, July 19, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
order
SS Standing Order
Fri 07/20 8:26 AM
ORDER requiring electronic filing of the administrative record in Social Security cases (See 6:10-mc-95-ORL-22, Doc. 1) Signed by Judge Anne C. Conway. (BES) |
|
2 | 2
service
Summons issued as to USA
Fri 07/20 8:25 AM
SUMMONS issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (BES) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/20 8:25 AM
COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number TPA 51961) filed by Nadine Williams.(BES) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |