Michigan Western District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00144
Case Filed:Jun 22, 2018
Last checked: Sunday Jul 22, 2018 3:19 AM EDT
defendant
Michael Todd Martin (1)
Represented By
Joanna Christine Kloet
Federal Public Defender (grand Rapids)
contact info
plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Sean M. Lewis
U.S. Attorney (grand Rapids)
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/22/2018 3:37 AM EDT
Thursday, June 07, 2018
WARRANT EXECUTED; defendant Michael Todd Martin arrested by FBI agent Garrett Croon in Benzonia, MI (USM Control Room, mac) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
(NON-DOCUMENT) ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as counsel for defendant Michael Todd Martin; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Michael Todd Martin (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Continuation of Criminal Complaint
3 3 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE of Tessa K. Hessmiller for USA (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
4 4 PENALTY SHEET re Complaint1 as to Michael Todd Martin (Lewis, Sean) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
5 5 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley of FIRST APPEARANCE of defendant Michael Todd Martin; Defendant's request for court-appointed counsel was granted; Defendant remanded to USM custody pending further proceedings before the Magistrate Judge (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SCHEDULING PROGRESSION OF CASE as to defendant Michael Todd Martin: preliminary hearing and detention hearings are set for 6/11/2018 at 03:00 PM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley (Magistrate Judge Timothy P. Greeley, ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
7 7 CJA 23 financial affidavit by defendant Michael Todd Martin in support of request for court-appointed counsel (ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 08, 2018
DEFENDANT Michael Todd Martin will be represented by Joanna Christine Kloet (Federal Public Defender, ) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
8 8 (RESTRICTED ACCESS) PRETRIAL SERVICES REPORT as to Michael Todd Martin [Access to this document is available to the Court and temporarily available to attorney(s) for USA, Michael Todd Martin only] (USPO Koon, Matthew)/jae)) Modified to revoke attorney access on 6/12/2018 (ald). [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 11, 2018
9 9 MINUTES held before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green of preliminary hearing as to defendant Michael Todd Martin; Defendant wived prelim; DETENTION hearing held; Government called Officer Felipe Martinez from Grand TraverseTribal Police for testimony; Government's Exhibits 1-4 received; Defendant detained and bound over to the Grand Jury for further proceedings (Proceedings Digitally Recorded) (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
10 10 WAIVER of preliminary hearing by defendant Michael Todd Martin (ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER that defendant Michael Todd Martin is bound over for further proceedings before the Grand Jury: status conference set or if indicted arraignment and initial pretrial conference are set for 6/28/2018 at 10:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 12, 2018
12 12 ORDER OF DETENTION pending trial as to defendant Michael Todd Martin; signed by Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green (ald) [1:18-mj-00193-PJG]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 22, 2018
13 13 FELONY INFORMATION as to Michael Todd Martin (ns)
Related: [-]
14 14 PENALTY SHEET re Information - Felony13 as to Michael Todd Martin (Lewis, Sean)
Related: [-]
15 15 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Michael Todd Martin (Lewis, Sean)
Related: [-]
16 16 NOTICE as to Michael Todd Martin: change of plea hearing is set for 6/25/2018 at 11:30 AM at 699 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker; (Chief Judge Robert J. Jonker, sdb)
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE OF HEARING as to defendant Michael Todd Martin arraignment and first appearance is set for 6/25/2018, at 11:00 AM at 601 Federal Building, Grand Rapids, MI before Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green; (Magistrate Judge Phillip J. Green, jkw)
Related: [-]