Harford County, Maryland et al v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45853 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1964 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 1:18-cv-01913 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:17 PM EST |
Defendant
Koninklijke Ahold Dehaize N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Novartis AG
|
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mylan N.V.
|
|
Defendant
Ilene Sackler Lefcourt
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc. d/b/a Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic Customer Support Center, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Hikma Pharmaceuticals PLC
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals LLC
|
|
Defendant
American Sales Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
SpecGx LLC
|
|
Defendant
West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreen Co.
50 West Broad St., Suite 1330
Columbus, OH 43215 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Value Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trust for the Benefit of Members of the Raymond Sackler Family
|
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz International GMBH
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Theresa Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Mortimer D.A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
David A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Beverly Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Ahold U.S.A., Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo International plc
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
|
|
Defendant/Intervenor
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Frederick County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Garrett County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Harford County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Frederick, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
City of Bowie, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mayor and Common Council of Westminster, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Caroline County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mayor and Council of Rockville, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Talbot County, Maryland
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:14 PM EDT |
Monday, June 25, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT FOR (1) VIOLATION OF MARYLAND CONSUMER PROTECTION ACT; (2) PUBLIC NUISANCE; (3) NEGLIGENCE; (4) UNJUST ENRICHMENT; AND (5) VIOLATION OF RACKETEER INFLUENCED AND CORRUPT ORGANIZATIONS ACT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7409102.), filed by The Mayor and Common Council of Westminster, Maryland, Caroline County, Maryland, Harford County, Maryland, City of Frederick, Maryland, Garrett County, Maryland, The Mayor and Council of Rockville, Maryland, City of Bowie, Maryland, Frederick County, Maryland, Talbot County, Maryland.(Pierce, John) [Transferred from mdd on 7/23/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons, | ||
Att: 12 Summons, | ||
Att: 13 Summons, | ||
Att: 14 Summons, | ||
Att: 15 Summons, | ||
Att: 16 Summons | ||
Tuesday, June 26, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued 21 days as to AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions Inc., Endo International PLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma L.P., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from mdd on 7/23/2018.] | |
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Maryland. Case number 1:18-cv-01913. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |