The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors v. U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-32406
Lead BK case is: 1:17-bk-32406
Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Janet S Baer |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-00261 |
Nature of Suit | 21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | Jul 23, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 23, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
41 | 41
misc
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 08/29 10:55 AM
Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Devon J Eggert on behalf of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. (Eggert, Devon) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
40 | 40
court
Transcript
Mon 08/26 11:40 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 08/13/2019. Remote electronic access to the excerpt/transcript is restricted until 11/25/2019. The excerpt/transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, contact the Court Reporter A Doolin, Telephone number 312-986-1920. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 9/9/2019. Redaction Request Due By 09/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 09/26/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/25/2019. (Doolin, Amy) |
|
Friday, August 23, 2019 | ||
39 | 39
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 08/23 8:57 AM
Adversary Case 1:18-ap-261 Closed . (Roman, Felipe) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2019 | ||
38 | 38
order
Generic Order
Fri 08/23 8:41 AM
Order Concluding Adversary Proceeding . Signed on 8/22/2019 (Roman, Felipe) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
37 | 37
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Fri 08/02 3:55 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 08/13/2019 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/24/2019. (Boyd, Shante) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
36 | 36
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Mon 07/01 4:22 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 07/24/2019 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 07/01/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
35 | 35
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 05/23 11:28 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 07/01/2019 at 02:00 PM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/23/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
34 | 34
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 05/14 11:20 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 05/23/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 05/14/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Wednesday, April 24, 2019 | ||
33 | 33
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 04/24 3:16 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 05/14/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 04/24/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, April 16, 2019 | ||
32 | 32
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 04/16 2:41 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 04/24/2019 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 04/16/2019. (McGee, Kimberly) |
|
Thursday, April 04, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 04/04 12:04 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 04/19/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 04/04/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, March 28, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
court
Transcript
Thu 03/28 9:29 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 02/13/2019. Remote electronic access to the excerpt/transcript is restricted until 06/26/2019. The excerpt/transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, contact the Court Reporter A Doolin, Telephone number 312-986-1920. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 4/11/2019. Redaction Request Due By 04/18/2019. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/29/2019. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/26/2019. (Doolin, Amy) |
|
Thursday, March 21, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 03/21 10:56 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 04/04/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 03/21/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, March 07, 2019 | ||
28 | 28
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 03/07 12:42 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 03/21/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 03/07/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, February 28, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 02/28 12:03 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 03/07/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/28/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 02/13 12:51 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 02/28/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/13/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, February 07, 2019 | ||
25 | 25
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 02/07 1:27 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 02/13/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 02/07/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 01/16 12:17 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 02/07/2019 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 01/16/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, January 10, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 01/10 11:18 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 01/17/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 01/10/2019. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, December 11, 2018 | ||
22 | 22
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 12/11 10:46 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 12/11/2018. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, November 20, 2018 | ||
21 | 21
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 11/20 11:34 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 12/11/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 11/20/2018. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
20 | 20
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Tue 11/06 10:29 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 11/20/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 11/06/2018. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Wednesday, October 24, 2018 | ||
19 | 19
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Wed 10/24 1:41 PM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 11/06/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 10/24/2018. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Monday, October 08, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 10/08 1:32 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Thomas S Kiriakos on behalf of Laureate Ltd.. (Kiriakos, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
17 | 17
order
Approve
Fri 10/05 7:06 AM
Order Granting Motion to Approve . Signed on 10/4/2018. (Roman, Felipe) |
|
Monday, October 01, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Approve
Mon 10/01 12:32 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Approve Stipulation to Substitute New Defendant Laureate Ltd. as Real Party-in-Interest Filed by Devon J Eggert on behalf of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 10/4/2018 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Eggert, Devon) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Wed 09/12 1:10 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement filed. Corporate parents added to case: Westbey Ltd. Filed by Craig E. Reimer on behalf of Laureate Ltd.. |
|
Tuesday, September 11, 2018 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Appearance
Tue 09/11 4:40 PM
Appearance Filed by Thomas S Kiriakos on behalf of Laureate Ltd.. (Kiriakos, Thomas) |
|
Friday, September 07, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extend Time
Mon 09/10 3:39 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time . Answer due by: 10/8/2018. Status hearing to be held on 10/24/2018 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. Signed on 9/7/2018. (Rodarte, Aida) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
court
Hearing Continued (Motion)
Thu 09/06 10:34 AM
(E)Hearing Continued . Status hearing scheduled for 10/24/2018 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 615 219 South Dearborn, Chicago, IL, 60604.. Signed on 09/06/2018. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Wednesday, September 05, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Appearance
Wed 09/05 2:43 PM
Appearance Filed by Joshua Gross on behalf of Laureate Ltd.. (Gross, Joshua) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Appearance
Wed 09/05 2:41 PM
Appearance Filed by Craig E. Reimer on behalf of Laureate Ltd.. |
|
9 | 9
motion
Extend Time
Wed 09/05 12:17 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion to Extend Time to Answer, Otherwise Plead, or Move to Dismiss Filed by Devon J Eggert on behalf of The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors. Hearing scheduled for 9/11/2018 at 09:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Eggert, Devon) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, August 22, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
order
Agreed Order
Wed 08/22 11:07 AM
(E)Order Withdrawing Motion for Agreed Order . Signed on 08/22/2018. (Dragonetti, Alex) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
order
Agreed Order
Thu 08/16 11:09 AM
(E)Order Granting Motion for Agreed Order . Signed on 08/16/2018. (Rodriguez, Shanda) |
|
Thursday, August 09, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Agreed Order
Thu 08/09 4:22 PM
Notice of Motion and Amended Motion for Agreed Order TO ENTER AGREED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, OTHERWISE PLEAD, OR MOVE TO DISMISS Filed by Michael Kelly on behalf of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Hearing scheduled for 8/16/2018 at 09:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Kelly, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
5 | 5
motion
Agreed Order
Thu 08/09 4:14 PM
Notice of Motion and Motion for Agreed Order TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, OTHERWISE PLEAD, OR MOVE TO DISMISS Filed by Michael Kelly on behalf of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Hearing scheduled for 8/22/2018 at 09:30 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Kelly, Michael) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Request for Service of Notices
Wed 07/25 12:18 PM
Request for Service of Notices Filed by Michael Kelly on behalf of U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. (Kelly, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 23, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 07/23 1:26 PM
Receipt of Complaint 18-00261 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 37689581. Fee Amount $ 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
2 | 2
court
Summons Issued (auto)
Mon 07/23 1:17 PM
Summons Issued on U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development Answer Due 08/22/2018 (Admin) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/23 1:17 PM
Adversary case 18-00261 (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)): Complaint by The Official Committee Of Unsecured Creditors against U.S. Department of Housing and Urban Development. Fee Amount $350. Status hearing to be held on 9/6/2018 at 10:00 AM at 219 South Dearborn, Courtroom 615, Chicago, Illinois 60604. (Eggert, Devon) |