Risk Management, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45857 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1346 Tort Claim |
Case Filed: | Jul 24, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Middle, 3:18-cv-00670 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:17 PM EST |
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Corporation
28727 Oregon Rd.
Perrysburg, OH 43551 |
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Amerisourcebergen Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Risk Management Inc
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 8:39 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 10, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053N-1792148.), filed by RISK MANAGEMENT, INC..(Whaley, John) [Transferred from lamd on 7/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Attachment Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 3 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 4 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 5 Affidavit SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 6 Attachment SUMONS, | ||
Att: 7 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 8 Attachment SUMMONSs, | ||
Att: 9 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 10 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 11 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 12 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 13 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 14 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 15 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 16 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 17 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 18 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 19 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 20 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 21 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 22 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 23 Attachment SUMMONS, | ||
Att: 24 Attachment SUMMONS | ||
Wednesday, July 11, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 Letter to JPML Panel notifying panel of possible JPML case. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 7/24/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Not Issued: Counsel has requested issuance of a summons for Defendants. The summons were not sent on the correct AO440 forms. Therefore, summons will not be issued. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 7/24/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Initial Conditional Transfer Order from the JPML Panel. (LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 7/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Minute Order NEF | ||
5 | 5 Order Transferring Case to JPML Court. Electronic letter sent.(LLH) [Transferred from lamd on 7/24/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Certified Transfer Order | ||
6 | 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Louisiana Middle. Case number 3:18-cv-00670. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |