Maryland District Court
Judge:Paul W Grimm
Case #: 1:18-cv-02268
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1446 Notice of Removal - Other Contract
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2018
Terminated:Apr 24, 2019
Last checked: Monday Jan 21, 2019 4:24 AM EST
Defendant
Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC
Represented By
John Leon Kazmierczak
Reed Smith, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Wiggins
3522 Parklawn Avenue
Baltimore, MD 21206

GPO Apr 24 2019
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Denying as Moot 11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; Directing Clerk to remand this case to the Circuit Court for Baltimore City and close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/24/2019. (c/m 4/24/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, April 24, 2019
17 17 1 pgs corresp Miscellaneous Wed 04/24 1:23 PM
Correspondence to the Circuit Court for Baltimore City re: Remand Letter (c/m 4/24/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
16 16 6 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Order Wed 04/24 1:10 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION and ORDER Denying as Moot11 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment; Directing Clerk to remand this case to the Circuit Court for Baltimore City and close this case. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 4/24/2019. (c/m 4/24/19 km4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 03, 2018
15 15 3 pgs respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 10/03 3:17 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC.(Kazmierczak, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 24, 2018
14 14 misc Jury Demand Tue 09/25 4:02 PM
Request to Demand Jury Trial by Kevin Wiggins.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
13 13 3 pgs respm Response Tue 09/25 3:55 PM
RESPONSE to11 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Kevin Wiggins.(heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
12 12 misc Rule 12/56 Tue 09/04 9:03 AM
Rule 12/56 letter mailed to Kevin Wiggins (c/m 9/4/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 31, 2018
11 11 18 pgs motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 08/31 10:48 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, in the Alternative, for Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC(Kazmierczak, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Edward Salazar
Thursday, August 23, 2018
10 10 2 pgs order Order Thu 08/23 11:19 AM
LETTER ORDER to parties regarding briefs. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/21/2018. (c/m 8/23/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
9 9 1 pgs order Order Fri 08/03 2:28 PM
LETTER ORDER to parties regarding the Scheduling of a Status Conference Call to August 16, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 8/3/2018. (c/m 8/3/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 31, 2018
8 8 3 pgs notice Notice (Other) Tue 07/31 4:21 PM
NOTICE by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC Intent to File Motion to Dismiss or Summary Judgment in Response to the Complaint (Kazmierczak, John)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
7 7 1 pgs order Order Fri 07/27 12:55 PM
LETTER ORDER to parties regarding the filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/27/2018. (c/m 7/27/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Supplemental Fri 07/27 10:32 AM
Supplemental to1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC(Kazmierczak, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Standing Order
Thursday, July 26, 2018
5 5 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/26 1:49 PM
NOTICE by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC re4 Standing Order Concerning Removal (Kazmierczak, John)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Standing Order Concerning Removal Thu 07/26 8:59 AM
Standing Order Concerning Removal re1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 7/26/2018. (c/m 7/26/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 corresp Miscellaneous Thu 07/26 8:58 AM
Removal Notification Letter sent to Parties.(c/m 7/26/2018 heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice QC Notice - Miscellaneous Thu 07/26 8:51 AM
QC NOTICE:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC was filed incorrectly. Each attachment must be specifically labeled (i.e. complaint, summons, etc). Please refile each attachment using the "Other Documents" category, select the "Supplemental" event, and link filing to 1 Notice of Removal. The first labeled attachment can be the main document and the other labeled documents as separate attachments. File any pending motions as separate docket entries (heps, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 07/25 3:01 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of Maryland for Baltimore City, case number 24-C-18-003351. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7464612), filed by Gateway One Lending & Finance, LLC.(Kazmierczak, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 16 pgs Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 3 2 pgs Exhibit Exhibit B