Santa Rosa County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45861 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Northern, 3:18-cv-01439 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:18 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
J.M. Smith Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Santa Rosa County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 3:35 PM EST |
Wednesday, June 20, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 281 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4209480.), filed by SANTA ROSA COUNTY. (MOUGEY, PETER) [Transferred from flnd on 7/25/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
2 | 2 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-43)(certified copy)- w/E-mail request from the Clerk, Northern District of Ohio, re MDL 2804. (sdw) [Transferred from flnd on 7/25/2018.] | |
Att: 1 E-mail Request | ||
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Northern. Case number 3:18-cv-01439. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |