City of North Miami, Florida v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45872 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 25, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Florida Southern, 1:18-cv-22133 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:19 PM EST |
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Noramco, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Publix Super Markets, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.,
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc.,
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Anda, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
|
Plaintiff
City of North Miami, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 11/04/2019 3:35 PM EST |
Wednesday, May 30, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 230 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-10693031, filed by CITY OF NORTH MIAMI, FLORIDA.(Mougey, Peter) [Transferred from flsd on 7/25/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas) [Transferred from flsd on 7/25/2018.] | |
Thursday, May 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jeffrey Gaddy and Neil E McWilliams Jr, mailing date May 31, 2018, (pt) [Transferred from flsd on 7/25/2018.] | |
4 | 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Ronald Book, mailing date May 31, 2018, (pt) [Transferred from flsd on 7/25/2018.] | |
Friday, July 20, 2018 | ||
5 | 5 ORDER CLOSING CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACING MATTER IN CIVIL SUSPENSE FILE Closing Case. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 7/20/2018. See attached document for full details. (lfs) [Transferred from flsd on 7/25/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-45) transferring case to the Northern District of Ohio re: MDL 2804 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. (Signed by Jeffrey N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from flsd on 7/25/2018.] | |
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Southern. Case number 1:18-cv-22133. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |