Puerto Rico Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Enrique S Lamoutte Inclan
Case #: 3:18-bk-04224
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2018
Terminated:Dec 01, 2021
Plan Confirmed:May 06, 2021

TypeOther Entity Type
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
ANAUDI J HERNANDEZ
550 Ave de la Constitucion Apt 309
San Juan, PR 00901-2313
Represented By
FAUSTO DAVID GODREAU ZAYAS
Godreau & Gonzalez Law
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
MONSITA LECAROZ ARRIBAS
OFFICE OF THE US TRUSTEE (UST) OCHOA BUILDING 500 TANCA STREET SUITE 301
SAN JUAN, PR 00901


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Saturday, December 02, 2023
461 461 misc Certificate of service Sun 12/03 1:33 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] Notice Date 12/02/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 460
Thursday, November 30, 2023
460 460 order Recusal Contested Matter Only Thu 11/30 1:49 PM
ORDER: The undersigned judge disqualifies from the contested matter only. Clerk to reassign to another judge. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed on 11/30/2023. Related [+].(RODRIGUEZ RODRIGUEZ, DENNIS)
Related: [-] 451 ,453 ,455 ,459
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
459 459 misc Compliance Wed 11/29 1:07 PM
Motion in Compliance Related [+]. Filed by RAFAEL A GONZALEZ VALIENTE on behalf of ANAUDI JAVIER HERNANDEZ PEREZ (GONZALEZ VALIENTE, RAFAEL)
Related: [-] 457