Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Hildy Bowbeer
Case #: 0:18-cv-02191
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 26, 2018
Terminated:May 31, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 22, 2019 2:19 AM CST
Counter Claimant
Taran Leight
Represented By
Ryan L Kaess
Kaess Law LLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Kaitlin M. Larsen
Represented By
Zorislav R Leyderman
The Law Office Of Zorislav R. Leyderman
contact info
Cross Claimant
Taran Leight
Represented By
Ryan L Kaess
Kaess Law LLC
contact info
Cross Defendant
Isanti County
Represented By
Dyan J Ebert
Quinlivan & Hughes, PA
contact info
Cally R Kjellberg-Nelson
Quinlivan & Hughes, PA
contact info
Defendant
Isanti County
Represented By
Dyan J Ebert
Quinlivan & Hughes, PA
contact info
Cally R Kjellberg-Nelson
Quinlivan & Hughes, PA
contact info
Defendant
Taran Leight
Represented By
Ryan L Kaess
Kaess Law LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jacob Zigan
Represented By
Michael T Rengel
Pemberton Sorlie Rufer & Kershner
contact info
Plaintiff
Kaitlin M. Larsen
Represented By
Zorislav R Leyderman
The Law Office Of Zorislav R. Leyderman
contact info

GPO Jan 25 2019
ORDER granting 12 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Leight's Counterclaim; striking 9 Defendant Leight's Counterclaim; denying 25 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Record. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/25/2019. (JMK)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, June 03, 2019
46 46 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Mon 06/03 9:29 AM
JUDGMENT(MMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Friday, May 31, 2019
45 45 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 05/31 3:40 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 5/31/2019. (HAZ)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
44 44 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 05/28 10:25 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re43 Stipulation of Dismissal. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
43 43 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 05/28 10:24 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Isanti County. Jointly Signed by Kaitlin M. Larsen and Jacob Zigan. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
42 42 order Judgment (Clerk's Office Only) Mon 05/13 1:55 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Kaitlin M. Larsen against Taran Leight(MMG)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal
Thursday, May 09, 2019
41 41 minutes Settlement Conference Fri 05/10 10:26 AM
Minute Entry for Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 5/9/2019. Settlement reached. Terms stated on the record. (JMK)
Related: [-]
40 40 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Thu 05/09 9:33 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Kaitlin M. Larsen (Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 03, 2019
39 39 order Order on Motion to Dismiss/General Wed 04/03 4:13 PM
(Text only) ORDER granting37 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Taran Leight's cross claim against Defendant Isanti County. Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 4/3/2019. (HAZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2019
38 38 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/29 2:36 PM
NOTICE by Isanti County to Withdraw Motion to Dismiss Defendant Leight's Cross Claim (Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
Related: [-]
37 37 motion Dismiss/General Fri 03/29 12:07 PM
First MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Taran Leight. (Kaess, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2019
36 36 respm Reply Memorandum or Notice of No Reply to Response to Motion Mon 03/11 12:03 PM
Reply to Response to Motion re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Isanti County, Isanti County.(Kjellberg-Nelson, Cally)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Tuesday, March 05, 2019
35 35 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 03/05 11:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Kaitlin M. Larsen, Kaitlin M. Larsen.(Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 12, 2019
34 34 misc Proposed Order to Judge - Other Tue 02/12 11:47 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re30 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Meet and Confer Statement Tue 02/12 11:46 AM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re30 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Isanti County, Isanti County.(Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
32 32 4 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 02/12 11:45 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Isanti County, Isanti County.(Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
31 31 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 02/12 11:44 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION30 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Date and time to be determined. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 02/12 11:42 AM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Isanti County, Isanti County. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 11, 2019
29 29 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Mon 02/11 3:25 PM
ORDER resetting SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 4/29/2019. Confidential Letter to Court due by 5/2/2019. Settlement Conference set for 5/9/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/11/2019. (JMK)
Related: [-]
28 28 minutes Status Conference Mon 02/11 3:08 PM
Minute Entry for telephone Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 2/11/2019 regarding rescheduling settlement conference. (JMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 25, 2019
27 27 6 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/General Order on Motion to Supplement Record Fri 01/25 6:40 PM
ORDER granting12 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Leight's Counterclaim; striking9 Defendant Leight's Counterclaim; denying25 Plaintiff's Motion to Supplement the Record. (Written Opinion) Signed by Chief Judge John R. Tunheim on 1/25/2019. (JMK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 23, 2019
26 26 respm Exhibit (Motions and Related Filings) Wed 01/23 1:37 PM
EXHIBIT 1 re25 MOTION to Supplement Record filed by Kaitlin M. Larsen, Kaitlin M. Larsen.(Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 22, 2019
25 25 motion Supplement Record Tue 01/22 12:10 PM
MOTION to Supplement Record filed by Kaitlin M. Larsen, Kaitlin M. Larsen.(Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1
Tuesday, January 08, 2019
24 24 notice Notice to Attorney Tue 01/08 11:03 AM
(Text-Only) NOTICE to Attorney: Chief Judge Tunheim will hear Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss [Docket No. 12] on the papers submitted, without a hearing. A written order will be forthcoming. (HAZ)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 28, 2018
23 23 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Fri 12/28 8:37 AM
ORDER Setting SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/15/2019. Confidential Letter to Court due by 3/20/2019. Settlement Conference set for 3/27/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/28/2018. (JMK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 20, 2018
22 22 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/20 10:30 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 3/1/2019. Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Motions (non-disp) due 11/15/2019. Motions (disp) due 1/15/2020. Ready for trial 4/15/2020. See attached Order for additional details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/20/2018. (ALM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 18, 2018
21 21 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 12/19 8:33 PM
Minute Entry for Pretrial Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/18/2018. A written Pretrial Scheduling Order will be issued. (JMK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
20 20 order Protective Order Tue 12/11 4:46 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 12/11/2018. (JMK)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 12/11 11:31 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re18 Stipulation. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation Tue 12/11 11:29 AM
STIPULATION for Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order by Isanti County. Jointly Signed by Kaitlin M. Larsen, Taran Leight, and Jacob Zigan. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Rule 26(f) Report Tue 12/11 11:15 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Filed by Isanti County. Jointly Signed by Kaitlin M. Larsen, Taran Leight, and Jacob Zigan.(Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 05, 2018
16 16 2 pgs respm Memorandum Wed 12/05 2:40 PM
MEMORANDUM re12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Jacob Zigan. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngel, Michael
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Monday, November 19, 2018
15 15 notice Notice to Attorney Mon 11/19 2:00 PM
(Text-Only) Notice to Attorney regarding Dispositive Motions briefing schedule : All dispositive motions must comply with Local Rule 7.1(c). Responses to dispositive motions shall be filed with the Court on or before 21 days after the service of the supporting memorandum to the original motion . Replies to responsive briefs shall be filed 14 days after the service of the response to the dispositive motion. Upon the motion being fully briefed and filed, counsel for the moving party shall email Chief Judge Tunheims chambers at Tunheim_Chambers@mnd.uscourts.gov to request a hearing date. Upon receiving from Chief Judge Tunheims Courtroom Deputy a hearing date, time and location, the moving party shall file the amended notice of hearing at that time. (HAZ)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 14, 2018
14 14 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Wed 11/14 11:55 PM
Declaration of Zorislav R. Leyderman in Support of12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kaitlin M. Larsen.(Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) 1-5
13 13 15 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Wed 11/14 11:54 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re12 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kaitlin M. Larsen.(Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Dismiss/General Wed 11/14 11:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Kaitlin M. Larsen. (Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
11 11 answer Answer to Crossclaim Wed 11/14 11:57 AM
ANSWER to Crossclaim filed by Isanti County. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 07, 2018
10 10 order Order/Notice of Hearing/Deadlines (Setting/Resetting) Wed 11/07 9:26 AM
ORDER Setting PRETRIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 12/11/2018. Pretrial Conference set for 12/18/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6B (STP) before Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer on 11/6/2018. (JMK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Wednesday, October 24, 2018
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Crossclaim Counterclaim Wed 10/24 12:36 PM
Taran Leight ANSWER to Complaint Kaitlin Larsen , First CROSSCLAIM against Isanti County., First COUNTERCLAIM Kaitlin Larsen against Kaitlin M. Larsen. filed by Taran Leight. (Kaess, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 13, 2018
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/13 4:51 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Jacob Zigan. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngel, Michael
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/13 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael T Rengel on behalf of Jacob Zigan. Related [+]
Related: [-] ngel, Michael
Friday, August 17, 2018
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/17 12:40 PM
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Isanti County. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 14, 2018
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 08/14 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dyan J Ebert on behalf of Isanti County. (Ebert, Dyan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 30, 2018
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/30 10:37 AM
TEXT ONLY NOTICE: Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer's Practice Pointers, which have recently been revised, are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's website (www.mnd.uscourts.gov). All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including any variances from the Local Rules. (JMK)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 07/27 7:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Isanti County, Taran Leight, Jacob Zigan. (AKL)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 07/27 7:42 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Chief Judge John R. Tunheim per 3rd, 4th - Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 18cv2191 JRT/HB. (AKL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 26, 2018
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 07/26 9:42 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6257530) filed by Kaitlin M. Larsen. Filer requests summons issued. (Leyderman, Zorislav)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet