New Jersey District Court
Case #: 2:18-cr-00428
Case Filed:Jul 25, 2018
Last checked: Friday Jul 27, 2018 3:16 AM EDT
Defendant
JOEL ROBBINS (1)
Represented By
PATRICK N. MCMAHON
Federal Public Defender
contact info
PERRY PRIMAVERA
Law Offices Of Perry Primavera
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
JASON SCOTT GOULD
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/27/2018 5:31 AM EDT
Monday, December 04, 2017
Arrest of JOEL ROBBINS, WANDA SOEL (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by JOEL ROBBINS placed on the record. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to JOEL ROBBINS (1), WANDA SOEL (2). (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
2 2 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson:Attorney Appointment Hearing as to JOEL ROBBINS held on 12/4/2017, Initial Appearance as to JOEL ROBBINS held on 12/4/2017 (CD #ECR.) (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to JOEL ROBBINS PATRICK N. MCMAHON for JOEL ROBBINS appointed.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/4/17. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF DETENTION as to JOEL ROBBINS. Defendant remanded w/o prejudice.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/4/17. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JOEL ROBBINS Time excluded from 12/4/17 until 1/31/18.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 12/4/17. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2018
13 13 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JOEL ROBBINS Time excluded from 1/30/18 until 3/31/18.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 1/30/18. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2018
15 15 CJA 20 as to JOEL ROBBINS: Appointment of Attorney PERRY PRIMAVERA for JOEL ROBBINS.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 2/26/18. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 22, 2018
16 16 TEXT ORDER as to JOEL ROBBINS: In person status hearing scheduled for 3/27/18 at 3:00 p.m. Defendant is to be produced for the hearing.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/22/18. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 27, 2018
17 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson:Status Conference as to JOEL ROBBINS held on 3/27/2018 (CD #ECR.) (nm, ) (nm). [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 29, 2018
18 18 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JOEL ROBBINS Time excluded from 3/29/18 until 5/31/18.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 3/29/18. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 31, 2018
20 20 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to JOEL ROBBINS Time excluded from 5/31/18 until 7/31/18.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 5/31/18. (nm, ) [2:17-mj-06694-JAD]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
21 21 INFORMATION as to JOEL ROBBINS (1) count(s) 1-4, 5-6. (mfg, )
Related: [-]
22 22 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by JOEL ROBBINS. (mfg, )
Related: [-]
23 23 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Katharine S. Hayden: Plea Agreement Hearing as to JOEL ROBBINS held on 7/25/2018, Plea entered by JOEL ROBBINS (1) Guilty Count 1-4, 5-6. Sentencing set for 11/1/2018 at 11:00 AM in Newark - Courtroom 5 before Judge Katharine S. Hayden. (Court Reporter LAURIE ENGEMANN.) (mfg, )
Related: [-]
24 24 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to JOEL ROBBINS. (mfg, )
Related: [-]
25 25 PLEA AGREEMENT as to JOEL ROBBINS. (mfg, )
Related: [-]