Town of Georgetown, Massachusetts v. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:18-op-45879 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 26, 2018 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 1:18-cv-11338 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 6:19 PM EST |
Defendant
RiteAid Corp.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart Stores East, LP Individually
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Town of Georgetown, Massachusetts
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/08/2019 4:47 PM EDT |
Wednesday, June 27, 2018 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7204453 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Town of Georgetown, Massachusetts.(Sandman, Richard) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Category Form | ||
2 | 2 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge George A. OToole, Jr assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Marianne B. Bowler. (McKillop, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLS, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, CVS Health Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, McKesson Corporation, Noramco, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., RiteAid Corporation, SpecGX, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walmart, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
Thursday, June 28, 2018 | ||
4 | 4 Judge George A. O'Toole, Jr: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Pursuant to 28 USC sec. 455(b)(4), I recuse myself from participation in this matter and direct the Clerk forthwith to reassign the case randomly to another District Judge.(Halley, Taylor) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
5 | 5 ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Judge Allison D. Burroughs added. Judge George A. OToole, Jr no longer assigned to case. (Danieli, Chris) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
Tuesday, July 24, 2018 | ||
6 | 6 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 45 in MDL Case 2408 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
Wednesday, July 25, 2018 | ||
7 | 7 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number CTO-45 in MDL Case 2804 received from District of Ohio (Northern) requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (McDonagh, Christina) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
8 | 8 Case transferred to to District of Ohio (Northern) pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 7/24/2018 Original file and certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically to the Clerk in that district. (McDonagh, Christina) [Transferred from mad on 7/26/2018.] | |
Thursday, July 26, 2018 | ||
9 | 9 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:18-cv-11338. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |