Caruso v. That's Good HR, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50203 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 27, 2018 |
Terminated: | Feb 13, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
That's Good HR, Inc.
8440 Woodfield Crossing Blvd., Suite 370
Indianapolis, IN 46240 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, July 18, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
misc
Withdrawal as Attorney, Notice of
Mon 07/18 11:51 AM
Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Defendant That's Good HR, Inc. (Jurkiewicz, David) |
|
Friday, February 22, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Fri 02/22 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291203. (TW) |
||
Wednesday, February 13, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 02/13 2:12 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 02/13/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (304395)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
16 | 16
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Wed 02/13 11:02 AM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50203] Closed. (lak) |
|
Tuesday, February 05, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Tue 02/05 11:24 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by David J. Jurkiewicz, Elizabeth N. Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso, Defendant That's Good HR, Inc. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, January 16, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
Minute Entry/Order
Wed 01/16 3:21 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 01/16/2019, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (302397)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Friday, November 30, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Fri 11/30 12:21 PM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 1/16/2019 at 01:30 PM EST via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Tuesday, November 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 11/06 10:41 AM
Answer to Complaint filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Defendant That's Good HR, Inc . (Jurkiewicz, David) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Wed 09/26 4:19 PM
Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Answer . Time to file extended to 10/26/2018. Attorney for Defendant That's Good HR, Inc. must distribute this order. (hmb) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Wed 09/26 10:13 AM
Motion to Extend Time to File Answer filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Defendant That's Good HR, Inc. (Jurkiewicz, David) |
|
Friday, August 10, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Fri 08/10 1:30 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Defendant That's Good HR, Inc. (Jurkiewicz, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 08, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Wed 08/08 2:11 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Appearance . Deficiency to be cured by 8/22/2018. (lak) |
|
7 | 7
notice
Extension of Time to File, Notice of
Wed 08/08 9:54 AM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Defendant That's Good HR, Inc . Adversary Answer due by 9/26/2018. (Jurkiewicz, David) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Appearance
Wed 08/08 9:44 AM
Appearance filed by David J. Jurkiewicz on behalf of Defendant That's Good HR, Inc. (Jurkiewicz, David) |
|
Wednesday, August 01, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 08/01 12:31 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: That's Good HR, Inc . (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Mon 07/30 8:28 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 08/13/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 8/29/2018. (btw) |
|
Friday, July 27, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Fri 07/27 12:45 PM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 07/27 12:43 PM
Appearance filed by Elizabeth N. Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 07/27 12:42 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50203 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) That's Good HR, Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |