Ohio Northern District Court
Judge:Jeffrey J Helmick
Case #: 3:18-cv-01740
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 27, 2018
Terminated:Feb 26, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 23, 2019 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
Autoneum North America, Inc.
4400 Easton Commons Way Suite 125
Columbus, OH 43219
Represented By
David R. Vance
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Lauren M. Drabic
Zashin & Rich - Cleveland
contact info
Plaintiff
Cody Frye
37 South Wynn Road
Oregon, OH 43606
Represented By
Francis J. Landry
Wasserman, Bryan, Landry & Honold - Perrysburg
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, February 26, 2019
14 14 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Dismissing Case Tue 02/26 2:05 PM
Stipulation and Judgment Entry of Case Dismissal . The within cause be and the same is hereby dismissed in its entirety with prejudice. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that each party shall bear his/its own costs. re13 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/26/2019. (SG,D)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 25, 2019
13 13 notice Stipulation Mon 02/25 2:28 PM
Proposed Stipulation and Judgment Entry of Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Cody Frye. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 04, 2019
12 12 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Order Mon 02/04 9:50 AM
Order : Counsel for the parties having reported this case has been settled, the telephone status conference set for February 6, 2019, is vacated. The parties shall file a stipulated notice of dismissal within 30 days of this Order. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 2/4/2019. (SG,D)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 26, 2018
11 11 notice Notice of Service Wed 12/26 9:27 AM
Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Requests for Production of Documents filed by Cody Frye. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 21, 2018
10 10 order Stipulation & Order Fri 12/21 11:48 AM
Stipulation & Order granting Frye and Autoneum and extension of time to complete responses to Autoneum's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production no later than December 26, 2018. re9 . Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 12/21/2018. (S,AL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 19, 2018
9 9 notice Stipulation Wed 12/19 2:02 PM
Joint Proposed Stipulation of Deadline for Plaintiff to Produce Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and First Requests for Production filed by Autoneum North America, Inc.. (Drabic, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 02, 2018
8 8 notice Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 10/02 2:30 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Autoneum America Corporation, Corporate Parent Autoneum Holding AG for Autoneum North America, Inc. filed by Autoneum North America, Inc.. (Vance, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 10/02 2:17 PM
Answer to1 Complaint, with Jury Demand filed by Autoneum North America, Inc.. (Vance, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 11, 2018
6 6 minutes 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Minute Order _ Case Management Conference Tue 09/11 1:58 PM
Order of Case Management Conference held on 9/11/2018. Case is assigned to the standard track. Discovery due by 3/1/2019. Parties to be Joined and Pleading Amendments due by 11/2/2018. Demand to be served by mid January 2019; Defendant to respond by end of January 2019. Another Telephone Conference set for 2/6/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick. The Court will initiate the call. Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick on 9/11/2018. Time: 10 minutes (SG,D)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 04, 2018
5 5 notice Report of Parties Planning Meeting Tue 09/04 10:41 AM
Report of Parties' Planning Meeting - parties do not consent to this case being assigned to the magistrate judge, filed by Autoneum North America, Inc.. (Vance, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 13, 2018
4 4 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings Case Management Conference Scheduling Order Mon 08/13 4:32 PM
Case Management Conference Scheduling Notice: conference to be held on 9/11/2018 at 11:00 AM in Chambers 210 before Judge Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick.(S,AL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Report of Parties Planning Meeting
Friday, August 03, 2018
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 08/03 3:00 PM
Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Cody Frye. Autoneum North America, Inc. waiver sent on 8/3/2018, answer due 10/2/2018 filed on behalf of Cody Frye (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 27, 2018
2 2 oth_evt Magistrate Consent Form Issued by Intake Fri 07/27 10:14 AM
Magistrate Consent Form issued. No summons provided or issued. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 07/27 9:51 AM
Complaint with jury demand against Autoneum North America, Inc. Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8827972, filed by Cody Frye. (Landry, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Copy of EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Copy of EEOC Charge,
Att: 3 Copy of Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 4 Copy of Notice of Right to Sue,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judge Fri 07/27 10:12 AM
Judge Jeffrey J. Helmick assigned to case. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge Fri 07/27 10:12 AM
Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge James R. Knepp, II. (M,TL)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Notice re Prompt Service Fri 07/27 10:15 AM
Notice re Prompt Service. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for promptly serving the Complaint on Defendant(s) upon receiving the issued summons from the Clerk and, after service has been perfected, electronically filing a Return of Service or an executed Waiver of Service for each Defendant. Service is to be accomplished pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4, which includes provisions for personal service and waiver of service, and Local Rule 4.2. If you wish the Clerk to serve the Complaint on Defendant(s) (a seldom used alternative because it does not save time or money), you must provide the Clerk's office with copies of the Complaint along with other necessary documents, in the manner set forth in Local Rule 4.2(a). (M,TL)
Related: [-]