New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:18-cr-00460
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2018
Terminated:Dec 10, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 28, 2024 10:21 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Daniel Marc Tracer
Doj, United States Attorney'S Office, Sdny
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Ignacio Foncillas (1)
Terminated: 12/10/2018
Represented By
Daniel J. Fetterman
Kasowitz, Benson, Torres Llp (nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/28/2024 5:44 PM EST
Friday, June 22, 2018
1 1 1 pgs NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE an Information by U.S.A. as to Ignacio Foncillas. (jm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 28, 2018
Arrest of Ignacio Foncillas. (jm)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels:Initial Appearance as to Ignacio Foncillas held on 6/28/2018. Defendant is present with attorney Daniel Fetterman; AUSA Daniel Tracer is also present. Defendant's bail is set as follows: $1,000,000 PRB to be signed by wife Leslie Bettison and two (2) FRP within five (5) business days; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL & points in-between for travel; surrender travel documents & no new applications (Defendant's passport shall be held by Pretrial, and Pretrial is ordered to return the passport one (1) business day prior to any travel approved by both Pretrial and the USAO. When passport is returned, the passport of Defendant's wife and children shall be surrendered. Defendant shall return his passport to Pretrial one (1) business day following his return); regular Pretrial supervision; drug testing/treatment as directed by Pretrial. Defendant shall be released on his own signature. (jm)
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George B. Daniels:Arraignment as to Ignacio Foncillas (1) Count 1 held on 6/28/2018. Defendant is present with attorneys Daniel J. Fetterman and Olga Lucia Fuentes Skinner; AUSA Daniel Tracer, USPTSO Cunningham, Court Reporter and HSI Special Agent Salvatore Comparato. Defendant waived prosecution by indictment. Preliminary Forfeiture Order entered on Defendant's consent in the amount of $9,414,373.56. Plea entered by Ignacio Foncillas (1) Guilty as to Count 1., As to Ignacio Foncillas( Sentencing set for 11/8/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (jm)
Related: [-]
Case Designated ECF as to Ignacio Foncillas. (jm)
Related: [-]
2 2 6 pgs INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Ignacio Foncillas (1) count(s) 1. (jm)
Related: [-]
3 3 7 pgs PRB Bond Entered as to Ignacio Foncillas in amount of $ 1,000,000, to be signed by wife Leslie Bettison and two (2) FRP within five (5) business days; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL & points in-between for travel; surrender travel documents & no new applications (Defendant's passport shall be held by Pretrial, and Pretrial is ordered to return the passport one (1) business day prior to any travel approved by both Pretrial and the USAO. When passport is returned, the passport of Defendant's wife and children shall be surrendered. Defendant shall return his passport to Pretrial one (1) business day following his return); regular Pretrial supervision; drug testing/treatment as directed by Pretrial. Defendant shall be released on his own signature. (jm)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Ignacio Foncillas. (jm)
Related: [-]
5 5 5 pgs ORDER DIRECTING FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY as to Ignacio Foncillas. As a result of the offense charged in Count One of the Information, to which the defendant plead guilty, the Money Judgment in the amount of $9,414,373.56 in United States currency, representing the amount of property involved in the offense chargedin Count One of the Information, shall be entered against thedefendant. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 6/28/18)(jm)
Related: [-]