Caruso v. Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50208 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2018 |
Terminated: | May 07, 2019 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc.
15600 San Pedro Avenue, Suite 302
San Antonio, TX 78232 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah Caruso
Chapter 7 Bankruptcy Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania St, Ste 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Monday, September 23, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
court
Minute Entry/Order Vacated
Mon 09/23 8:15 AM
Minute Entry/Order: re: Trial11 . Joint stipulation of dismissal filed 4/29/19. Hearing vacated. (hmb) |
|
Thursday, May 16, 2019 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Thu 05/16 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 291632. (TW) |
||
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 05/07 3:51 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50208] Closed. (lak) |
|
Monday, April 29, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Mon 04/29 12:36 PM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Harley K Means, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso, Defendant Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Thursday, January 24, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Thu 01/24 2:53 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Selected Mediator and to Submit Proposed Mediation Schedule . Time to select a mediator is extended to 2/22/2019. Time to submit a proposed mediation schedule is extended to 3/12/2019. Attorney for Plaintiff Deborah Caruso must distribute this order. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, January 23, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Wed 01/23 9:49 AM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Selected Mediator and to Submit Proposed Mediation Schedule filed by Harley K Means, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso, Defendant Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Friday, December 28, 2018 | ||
13 | 13
order
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Order on Motion to
Fri 12/28 2:34 PM
Order Granting Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Selected Mediator and to Submit Proposed Mediation Schedule . Time to select a mediator is extended to 1/25/2019. Time to submit a proposed mediation schedule is extended to 2/12/2019. Attorney for Plaintiff Deborah Caruso must distribute this order. (btw) |
|
Thursday, December 27, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extend Time to File Adversary Documents, Motion to
Thu 12/27 3:06 PM
Agreed Motion to Extend Time to File Selected Mediator and to Submit Proposed Mediation Schedule filed by Harley K Means, Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso, Defendant Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Wednesday, December 12, 2018 | ||
11 | 11
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 12/13 2:48 PM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 12/12/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (301696)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Wednesday, November 14, 2018 | ||
10 | 10
court
Minute Entry/Order
Thu 11/15 8:27 AM
Minute Order . Hearing DATE: 11/14/2018, MATTER: Status conference DISPOSITION: See Attached PDF document for details. (vCal Hearing ID (299888)). (HeatherMButler) |
|
Friday, October 05, 2018 | ||
9 | 9
court
Notice w/options for Hearings/Conferences/Etc.
Fri 10/05 2:00 PM
Notice of Status Teleconference. Status teleconference to be held on 11/14/2018 at 01:30 PM EST via a teleconference at 888-273-3658; access code 6349352. (hmb) |
|
Thursday, September 27, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Thu 09/27 3:43 PM
Answer to Complaint filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc . (Means, Harley) |
|
Tuesday, August 21, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Corporate Ownership Statement
Tue 08/21 1:53 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FRBP 7007.1 filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc. (Means, Harley) |
|
6 | 6
notice
Extension of Time to File, Notice of
Tue 08/21 1:53 PM
Notice of Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc . Adversary Answer due by 9/27/2018. (Means, Harley) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Tue 08/21 1:51 PM
Appearance filed by Harley K Means on behalf of Defendant Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc. (Means, Harley) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Thu 08/02 1:14 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc . (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
Tuesday, July 31, 2018 | ||
3 | 3
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Tue 07/31 10:56 AM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 08/14/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 8/30/2018. (btw) |
|
Monday, July 30, 2018 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Mon 07/30 8:38 AM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Mon 07/30 8:37 AM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50208 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah Caruso against Defendant(s) Deaf Interpreter Services, Inc. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Theisen, Meredith) |