California Eastern District Court
Case #: 1:18-sw-00268
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2018
Terminated:Jul 10, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 01, 2018 12:11 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Laura Withers
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
1641 E. Olive Avenue Fresno, CA 93728 (1)
Terminated: 07/10/2018
Defendant
1998 Dodge Minivan, Grey, CA License 4BHZ638 (2)
Terminated: 07/10/2018

GPO Jul 10 2018
ORDER TO UNSEAL; GRANTING 4 Motion to Unseal as to 1641 E. Olive Avenue Fresno, CA 93728 (1), 1998 Dodge Minivan, Grey, CA License 4BHZ638 (2), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/18. (Martin-Gill, S)ORDER TO UNSEAL; GRANTING 4 Motion to Unseal as to 1641 E. Olive Avenue Fresno, CA 93728 (1), 1998 Dodge Minivan, Grey, CA License 4BHZ638 (2), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/10/18. (Martin-Gill, S)

Docket last updated: 08/01/2018 1:17 AM PDT
Monday, July 02, 2018
1 1 APPLICATION and SEARCH WARRANT ISSUED as to 1641 E. Olive Avenue Fresno, CA 93728, 1998 Dodge Minivan, Grey, CA License 4BHZ638. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Search & Seizure Warrant: 1643 E. Olive,
Att: 2 Search & Seizure Warrant: 1998 Grey Dodge Minivan
2 2 APPLICATION to SEAL as to 1641 E. Olive Avenue Fresno, CA 93728 and 1998 Dodge Minivan, Grey, CA License 4BHZ638 by USA. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER to SEAL CASE as to 1641 E. Olive Avenue Fresno, CA 93728 and 1998 Dodge Minivan, Grey, CA License 4BHZ638 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 7/2/2018. CASE SEALED. (Lundstrom, T)
Related: [-]