Johnsen v. Kirtz et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Beth Bloom |
Referred: | Bruce E Reinhart |
Case #: | 9:18-cv-81019 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 12:0022 Securities Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2018 |
Terminated: | Nov 30, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 29, 2019 4:00 AM EST |
Defendant
ICO Services, Inc.
7355 Mahogany Bend CT
Boca Raton, FL 33434 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sean R Kirtz
7355 Mahogany Bend Ct
Boca Raton, FL 33433 |
|
Mediator
Meah Rothman Tell
Meah Rothman Tell, PA PO Box 25490
Tamarac, FL 33320 |
|
Plaintiff
Andrew Johnsen
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
94 | 94
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Set Aside Judgment Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/27 8:02 AM
ORDER ON MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND MOTION TO RE-APPOINT COURT ORDERED MEDIATION. Denying90 Motion to Set Aside Judgment; Denying as moot91 Motion. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 6/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (cds) |
|
Tuesday, June 25, 2019 | ||
93 | 93
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/25 8:32 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re91 MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MEDIATION filed by Andrew Johnsen. Replies due by 7/2/2019. (Andre, Tony) |
|
92 | 92
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 06/25 8:31 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re90 MOTION to Set Aside Judgment filed by Andrew Johnsen. Replies due by 7/2/2019. (Andre, Tony) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
91 | 91
motion
Miscellaneous Relief
Thu 06/20 2:55 PM
MOTION TO RESCHEDULE MEDIATION by Andrew Johnsen. (lbc) |
|
90 | 90
motion
Set Aside Judgment
Thu 06/20 2:53 PM
MOTION to Set Aside Judgment by Andrew Johnsen. (lbc) |