Tennessee Eastern District Court
Judge:Curtis L Collier
Referred: Debra C Poplin
Case #: 3:18-cv-00317
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2018
Terminated:Jan 02, 2020
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 29, 2019 3:16 AM EST
Defendant
Steven Taylor
Represented By
E Jerome Melson
Gentry, Tipton & Mclemore, PC
contact info
John M Kizer
Gentry, Tipton & Mclemore, PC
contact info
Ronald E Mills
City Of Knoxville
contact info
Defendant
The City of Knoxville, Tennessee
Represented By
Ronald E Mills
City Of Knoxville
contact info
Plaintiff
Graff C Corby
Represented By
Paul Timothy Grandchamp
Quist, Fitzpatrick & Jarrard, PLLC
contact info
Ryan Jarrard
Quist, Fitzpatrick & Jarrard, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, July 01, 2020
43 43 misc Costs Taxed Wed 07/01 11:19 AM
Costs Taxed in amount of $2,902.65 against Defendant, Steven Taylor. (LEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
42 42 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Withdraw Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Tue 02/11 2:44 PM
ORDER granting 41 Motion to Withdraw ; terminating 38 Motion for Attorney Fees.The Court's Order referring motion 39 is WITHDRAWN. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on February 11, 2020. (SAC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
41 41 motion Withdraw Wed 02/05 10:18 AM
MOTION to Withdraw Motion for Award of Attorney Fees by Graff C Corby. (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 03, 2020
40 40 misc Bill of Costs Fri 01/03 6:51 PM
BILL OF COSTS by Graff C Corby. Please pay costs directly to the attorney for the prevailing party. .Bill of costs DDL set for 1/24/2020 .(Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit City of Knoxville Records Costs,
Att: 2 Exhibit Service of Summons Fees,
Att: 3 Exhibit Attendance and Transcript Fees - Parties,
Att: 4 Exhibit Attendance and Transcript Fees - Officer Cox,
Att: 5 Exhibit Witness Attendance Fee,
Att: 6 Exhibit Witness Attendance Fee,
Att: 7 Exhibit Witness Attendance Fee,
Att: 8 Exhibit Transcript Fee - Witness,
Att: 9 Exhibit Transcript Fee - Witness,
Att: 10 Exhibit Transcript Fee - Witness,
Att: 11 Exhibit Service of Subpoena Fees for Witnesses
Thursday, January 02, 2020
39 39 1 pgs order Order Referring Motion Thu 01/02 2:00 PM
ORDER REFERRING MOTION: 38 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Graff C Corby. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 1/2/2020. (AML)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 23, 2019
38 38 motion Attorney Fees Mon 12/23 11:39 AM
MOTION for Attorney Fees by Graff C Corby.(Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Itemized Time and Billing,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of P. Timothy Grandchamp,
Att: 3 Exhibit Awards in Other Cases
Monday, December 16, 2019
37 37 order Judgment Mon 12/16 3:49 PM
JUDGMENT, entered by the Clerk, re 36 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment in favor of Graff C Corby against Steven Taylor in the sum of $10,501.00 plus reasonable costs and reasonable attorney fees. (ABF)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 12/16 12:54 PM
NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by Graff C Corby(Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant's Offer of Judgment,
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Acceptance of Offer of Judgment
35 35 trial Witness List Mon 12/16 11:32 AM
WITNESS LIST by Graff C Corby. (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2019
34 34 motion Leave to File Document Mon 12/02 4:11 PM
First MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Graff C Corby.(Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Amended Complaint
Friday, November 01, 2019
33 33 service Certificate of Service Fri 11/01 4:32 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Graff C Corby Plaintiff's Rule 26(a)(2) Disclosure and Amended Answers to Interrogatories (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2019
32 32 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/08 4:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action served on Christopher Rush on 8/6/2019, filed by Graff C Corby. (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
31 31 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/08 4:56 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action served on Lucas Barnes on 8/6/2019, filed by Graff C Corby. (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
30 30 service Affidavit of Service Thu 08/08 4:54 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition in a Civil Action served on John Stoehr on 8/6/2019, filed by Graff C Corby. (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
29 29 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 07/24 10:53 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal Party City of Knoxville by Graff C Corby. (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 03, 2019
28 28 notice Certificate of Counsel Thu 01/03 4:37 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel Service of Answers to Defendant, City of Knoxville's, Written Discovery by Paul Timothy Grandchamp on behalf of Graff C Corby (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 29, 2018
27 27 notice Certificate of Counsel Sat 12/29 3:42 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel of Service of Answers to Defendant Taylor's Discovery by Paul Timothy Grandchamp on behalf of Graff C Corby (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 11, 2018
26 26 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 12/11 12:15 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Steven Taylor.(Mills, Ronald)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 12/11 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of Steven Taylor (Mills, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 29, 2018
24 24 order Scheduling Order Thu 11/29 4:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 5/11/2020 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/30/2020 04:00 PM in Courtroom 1B - Chattanooga before District Judge Curtis L Collier.Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger on 11/29/2018. (DJH, )
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Thu 11/29 10:06 AM
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 11/30 10:52 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Christopher H Steger: Scheduling Conference held in chambers w/o courtroom deputy on 11/29/2018. (KFB, )
Related: [-]
Friday, November 16, 2018
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/16 12:20 PM
NOTICE by The City of Knoxville, Tennessee of Service of Initial Disclosures (Mills, Ronald)
Related: [-]
21 21 notice Notice (Other) Fri 11/16 11:54 AM
NOTICE by Steven Taylor of Service of Initial Disclosures (Melson, E)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 02, 2018
20 20 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 11/02 2:03 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 11/29/2018 at 2:00 PM in Judge's Chambers before District Judge Curtis L Collier. (CBS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 26, 2018
19 19 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/26 12:30 PM
NOTICE by Graff C Corby Rule 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosure (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 10/26 12:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paul Timothy Grandchamp on behalf of Graff C Corby (Grandchamp, Paul)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 19, 2018
17 17 notice Notice of Consent/Nonconsent Wed 09/19 5:34 PM
NOTICE OF NONCONSENT by Steven Taylor, The City of Knoxville, Tennessee (Melson, E)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 10, 2018
16 16 1 pgs order Order Regarding Availability of Magistrate Judge Mon 09/10 9:05 AM
ORDER: The parties are ordered to confer and return the attached form within the time provided. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on September 10, 2018. (AYB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Other Notice of Consent/Non-Consent
Friday, September 07, 2018
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/07 5:59 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Steven Taylor.(Melson, E)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/07 5:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by The City of Knoxville, Tennessee.(Mills, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 30, 2018
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 08/30 12:35 PM
STIPULATION of Extension of Time by The City of Knoxville, Tennessee. (Mills, Ronald)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 08/30 12:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald E Mills on behalf of The City of Knoxville, Tennessee (Mills, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 15, 2018
11 11 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Wed 08/15 10:55 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graff C Corby. Steven Taylor served on 8/10/2018. (Jarrard, Ryan)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed (non-USA) Wed 08/15 10:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Graff C Corby. The City of Knoxville, Tennessee served on 8/10/2018. (Jarrard, Ryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
9 9 3 pgs order Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information Thu 08/02 1:57 PM
Order Governing Sealing Confidential Information. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order Governing Motions To Dismiss Thu 08/02 1:56 PM
Order Governing Motions To Dismiss. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP)
Related: [-]
7 7 1 pgs order Order Governing Depositions Thu 08/02 1:55 PM
Order Governing Depositions. Signed by District Judge Curtis L Collier on 08/02/2018. (AMP)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Deficiency (Not Pro Hac) Thu 08/02 1:54 PM
Administrative Notice to Counsel. No action to be taken. Informational only. For future reference, please do not enter the address information for the parties. Also, please file the Summons and Civil Cover Sheet in a flattened form. (AMP)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 08/02 1:35 PM
Summons Issued as to Steven Taylor, and The City of Knoxville, Tennessee. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons The City of Knoxville, Tennessee
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/02 1:00 PM
NOTICE by Graff C Corby Civil Cover Sheet (Jarrard, Ryan)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/02 12:37 PM
NOTICE by Graff C Corby Summons - City of Knoxville (Jarrard, Ryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 08/02 12:36 PM
NOTICE by Graff C Corby Summons - Steven Taylor (Jarrard, Ryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 08/02 12:19 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3733607.), filed by Graff C Corby.(Jarrard, Ryan)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 08/02 1:23 PM
District Judge Curtis L Collier and Magistrate Judge Debra C Poplin added. (AMP)
Related: [-]