Kentucky Eastern District Court
Case #: 5:18-cr-00096
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2018
Last checked: Friday Aug 03, 2018 3:41 AM EDT
Defendant
Dajour Terrell Bond (1)
Represented By
Andrew M. Stephens
contact info
Defendant
Trayvon Shieheam Wilson (2)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Lauren Tanner Bradley, AUSA
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Edky
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/03/2018 4:18 AM EDT
Friday, July 20, 2018
Arrest of Dajour Terrell Bond in Eastern District of Pennsylvania. (STC) [5:18-mj-06055-HAI]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 25, 2018
Conflict Check run. (STC) [5:18-mj-06055-HAI]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Dajour Terrell Bond (1). (STC) [5:18-mj-06055-HAI]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Affidavit Addendum
3 3 Rule 40 Documents Received as to Dajour Terrell Bond(STC) [5:18-mj-06055-HAI]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 EDPA Docket,
Att: 2 EDPA Order holding dft to Answer and Appear in District of Prosecution
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Lauren Tanner Bradley, AUSA appearing for USA. (Bradley, Lauren) [5:18-mj-06055-HAI]
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 02, 2018
Conflict Check run. (GLD)
Related: [-]
CJA Case Assignment by Clerk: APPOINTED CJA Attorney Andrew M. Stephens for Dajour Terrell Bond. cc: COR, USP, USM (SCD)
Related: [-]
6 6 INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Dajour Terrell Bond (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, Trayvon Shieheam Wilson (2) count(s) 1, 2. Forfeiture Allegation is not statistically counted or listed on docket sheet. (GLD) (GLD).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (8/2/2018) Sealed Unredacted Indictment
8 8 MOTION for Arraignment as to Dajour Terrell Bond. (GLD) Modified on 8/2/2018 (GLD).
Related: [-]
9 9 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to Trayvon Shieheam Wilson. (GLD)
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER as to Dajour Terrell Bond (1): Court GRANTS8 Motion for Arraignment and this matter is set for ARRAIGNMENT set for 8/6/2018 at 02:15 PM in LEXINGTON before Magistrate Judge J. Gregory Wehrman. Signed by Judge Joseph M. Hood on 8/2/2018. (GLD)cc: COR,USM,USP,D (GLD).
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: PDF DOCUMENT: Error: INCORRECT document attached to docket entry by docket clerk; INCORRECT; re11 Order on Motion for Arraignment, ; Correct document attached to this entry. cc: COR (GLD)
Related: [-]