Caruso v. Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, P.L.C.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50213 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Oct 04, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, P.L.C.
150 West Jefferson, Suite 2500
Detroit, MI 48226 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah J. Caruso
Chapter 7 Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Thursday, October 11, 2018 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Thu 10/11 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 290531. (TW) |
||
Thursday, October 04, 2018 | ||
8 | 8
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Thu 10/04 3:31 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50213] Closed. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, September 26, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Wed 09/26 4:50 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
Wednesday, August 15, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 08/15 12:47 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, P.L.C . (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 08/03 1:33 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 08/17/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 9/4/2018. (lak) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Amended Complaint
Fri 08/03 1:10 PM
Amended Complaint (no parties added), filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso . (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
3 | 3
court
Deficiency Notice - Miscellaneous
Fri 08/03 12:53 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint . Deficiency to be cured by 8/17/2018. (lak) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 08/03 11:51 AM
Appearance filed by Curt Derek Hochbein on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Hochbein, Curt) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/03 11:49 AM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50213 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah J. Caruso against Defendant(s) Miller, Canfield, Paddock and Stone, P.L.C. (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Hochbein, Curt) |