Caruso v. Laff Media, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:18-ap-50219 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Aug 03, 2018 |
Terminated: | Aug 27, 2018 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Laff Media, LLC
3500 Piedmont Road ND, Suite 400
Atlanta, GA 30305 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Deborah J. Caruso
Chapter 7 Trustee 135 N. Pennsylvania Street, Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 04, 2018 | ||
court
Receipt of Filing Fee (OTC)
Tue 09/04 7:30 PM
Receipt of Adversary Filing Fee for $350.00. Receipt Number 290316. (TW) |
||
Monday, August 27, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Mon 08/27 4:35 PM
Adversary Proceeding[LINK:1:18-ap-50219] Closed. (lak) |
|
Thursday, August 16, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Dismissal Notice re: Adversary Proceeding, Party, or Count
Thu 08/16 12:01 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Elizabeth N. Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
Monday, August 13, 2018 | ||
5 | 5
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Mon 08/13 3:17 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: Laff Media, LLC . (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 08/03 2:07 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 08/17/2018 . Adversary Answer due by 9/4/2018. (lak) |
|
3 | 3
notice
Appearance
Fri 08/03 12:52 PM
Appearance filed by Meredith R. Theisen on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Theisen, Meredith) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Appearance
Fri 08/03 12:51 PM
Appearance filed by Elizabeth N. Hahn on behalf of Plaintiff Deborah J. Caruso. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 08/03 12:50 PM
Adversary case[LINK 18-50219 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Deborah J. Caruso against Defendant(s) Laff Media, LLC (Fee deferred: $350) [12 ], [13]. (Hahn, Elizabeth) |