Myra Dickert et al v. Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Edward M Chen |
Case #: | 5:18-cv-04664 |
Nature of Suit | 195 Contract - Contract Product Liability |
Cause | 15:2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 02, 2018 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 29, 2019 12:39 AM PST |
Defendant
Panasonic Corporation of North America
109002 N. Tantau Avenue, Suite 200
Cupertino, CA 95014 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation
10900N. Tantau Avenue, Suite 200
Cupertino, CA 95014 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanyo North America Corporation
10900 N. Tantau Avenue, Suite 200
Cupertino, CA 95014 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Howard Dickert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Myra Dickert
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/24/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, September 13, 2018 | ||
18 | 18
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Thu 09/13 2:30 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING Consent or Declination: Defendants shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 9/27/2018. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (lmh, COURT STAFF) |
|
17 | 17
misc
Refund Status
Thu 09/13 10:53 AM
Refund Status re11 Application for Refund APPROVED. (rghS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Wednesday, September 12, 2018 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures
Wed 09/12 5:35 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation, Corporate Parent Panasonic Corporation (Netherlands) BV for Panasonic Corporation of North America. Defendants' Disclosure of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(A) and Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Singh, David) |
|
Monday, September 10, 2018 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Stipulation without Proposed Order
Mon 09/10 2:02 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Extending Defendants' Time to Move To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint (L.R. 6-1) filed by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (Singh, David) |
|
14 | 14
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/10 10:10 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Myra Dickert. Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Birka-White, David) |
|
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Mon 09/10 9:56 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Myra Dickert. Sanyo North America Corporation served on 9/9/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. (Birka-White, David) |
|
Thursday, September 06, 2018 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 09/06 3:51 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Myra Dickert. Panasonic Corporation of North America served on 8/8/2018, answer due 8/29/2018. (Birka-White, David) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Application for Refund
Thu 09/06 2:25 PM
Application for Refund, Receipt Number 0971-12563965 for duplicate payment of Plaintiff's initial filing fee by Myra Dickert. (Birka-White, David) |
|
10 | 10
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 09/06 2:09 PM
*Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re6 Summons Issued for Panasonic Corporation of North America (Birka-White, David) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
9 | 9
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 09/06 9:42 AM
*Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re6 Summons Issued for Sanyo North America Corporation (Birka-White, David) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
8 | 8
service
Certificate/Proof of Service
Thu 09/06 9:29 AM
*Filing Error* CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Myra Dickert re6 Summons Issued for Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation (Birka-White, David) Modified on 9/6/2018 (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Thu 09/06 3:15 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Incorrect event used. [err101] Please re-file in its entirety As Summons Returned Executed. Re: 8 Certificate of Service filed by Myra Dickert, 9 Certificate of Service filed by Myra Dickert, 10 Certificate of Service filed by Myra Dickert (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
||
Tuesday, August 07, 2018 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Consent/Declination to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge
Tue 08/07 4:15 PM
CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Myra Dickert.. (Birka-White, David) |
|
Friday, August 03, 2018 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Issued
Fri 08/03 11:22 AM
Summons Issued as to Panasonic Corporation of North America, Sanyo Energy (U.S.A.) Corporation, Sanyo North America Corporation. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
5 | 5
order
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines
Fri 08/03 10:52 AM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) |
|
Thursday, August 02, 2018 | ||
4 | 4
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Fri 08/03 10:21 AM
Case assigned to Judge Nathanael M. Cousins. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Myra Dickert and Howard Dickert (Birka-White, David) | |
2 | 2 Proposed Summons. (Birka-White, David) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT For Damages and Injunction (Class Action) against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-12564201.). Filed byMyra Dickert, Howard Dickert.(Birka-White, David) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |