California Central District Court
Judge:R Gary Klausner
Referred: Kenly Kiya Kato
Case #: 5:18-cv-01637
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Aug 03, 2018
Terminated:Sep 25, 2018
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 30, 2019 12:39 AM PST
Defendant
Sharif Robinson
Defendant
A.P.E. Processing, LLC
Plaintiff
Bryce Johnson
Represented By
Wayne A Sinnett
Sinnett Law Apc
contact info
Crystal Tammie Innabi
Sinnett Law Apc
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, September 25, 2018
13 13 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Tue 09/25 9:53 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. Dismissal is with prejudice.(Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proof of Service
Friday, September 21, 2018
12 12 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Fri 09/21 9:32 AM
SCHEDULING NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES AND ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner. The Court has reviewed the Notice of Settlement filed by plaintiff on September 20, 201811 . The parties are hereby notified that they are not relieved of any deadlines or Court appearances until a dismissal of the action is filed. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (sw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 20, 2018
11 11 notice Settlement Thu 09/20 12:49 PM
NOTICE of Settlement as to the Entire Case filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 20, 2018
10 10 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/20 3:42 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. upon Sharif Robinson(individually) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018; Sharif Robinson(in his official capacity) waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Ceasar D. Richbow, Esq.. (Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]
9 9 1 pgs service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 08/20 3:41 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. upon A.P.E. Processing, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 8/20/2018, answer due 10/19/2018. Waiver of Service signed by Ceasar D. Richbow, Esq.. (Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 08, 2018
8 8 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Wed 08/08 11:19 AM
STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
7 7 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/06 11:31 AM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants A.P.E. Processing, LLC, Sharif Robinson(individually), Sharif Robinson(in his official capacity). (et)
Related: [-]
6 6 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Mon 08/06 11:28 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Mon 08/06 11:28 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (et)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 03, 2018
4 4 2 pgs notice Summons Request Fri 08/03 5:57 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 08/03 5:56 PM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson, identifying None. (Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 08/03 5:56 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]
1 1 20 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 08/03 5:55 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22201481 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Bryce Johnson. (Attorney Crystal Tammie Innabi added to party Bryce Johnson(pty:pla))(Innabi, Crystal)
Related: [-]