California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Jacqueline Chooljian
Case #: 2:18-cv-06740
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2018
Terminated:Sep 11, 2018
Last checked: Saturday Feb 02, 2019 1:56 AM PST
Defendant
Barbizon Modeling and Acting Studio of Los Angeles
Defendant
Barbizon School of San Francisco
Defendant
Barbizon Modeling and Acting School of Southern California
Defendant
Barbizon Studio and Modeling of New York City
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Rozen Christine Lalas
Represented By
Christopher J Hamner
Hamner Law Offices Apc
contact info
Evelina M Serafini
Hamner Law Offices Aplc
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, September 10, 2018
8 8 notice Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1)) Mon 09/10 12:43 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Rozen Christine Lalas. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Hamner, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 07, 2018
7 7 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Tue 08/07 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (lh)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Tue 08/07 4:30 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Barbizon Modeling and Acting School of Southern California, Barbizon Modeling and Acting Studio of Los Angeles, Barbizon School of San Francisco, Barbizon Studio and Modeling of New York City. (lh)
Related: [-]
5 5 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Tue 08/07 4:05 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Tue 08/07 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 06, 2018
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Mon 08/06 3:31 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rozen Christine Lalas. (Hamner, Christopher)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Mon 08/06 3:28 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff Rozen Christine Lalas. (Hamner, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 08/06 3:23 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22207517 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rozen Christine Lalas. (Attorney Christopher J Hamner added to party Rozen Christine Lalas(pty:pla))(Hamner, Christopher)
Related: [-]